King v. Facebook, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Patricia King
Defendant: Cambridge Analytica LLC and Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02276
Filed: April 16, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2018 24 Featured Case Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Snyder.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
June 18, 2018 23 LETTER dated 6/14/18 from Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP to Clerk re defendants Cambridge Analytica, LLC and SCL USA INC. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
May 18, 2018 22 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Cambridge Analytica LLC filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 10, 2018 21 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/10/2018. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 9, 2018 20 REPLY (re #13 MOTION to Stay ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 3, 2018 19 Renotice motion hearing filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 18 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All pending motions will be taken off-calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing according to Judge Chhabria's available dates, which are listed on his webpage under the section "Scheduling Notes." The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. Case Management Statement due by 6/12/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/19/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 1, 2018 17 Case Reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
April 30, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASES. Cases ordered related to 18-cv-1732-VC, Price v. Facebook, Inc.: 18-cv-02090-SK, Picha v. Facebook Inc.; 18-cv-02093-KAW, abajo v. Facebook Inc.; 18-cv-02122-HSG, Iron Wing v. Facebook, Inc.; 18-cv-02127-SI, Johnson v. Facebook, Inc.; 18-cv-02189-KAW, Buckles v. Facebook, Inc.; 18-cv-02201-MEJ, Gerena v. Facebook, Inc.; and 18-cv-02276-YGR, King v. Facebook, Inc. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/30/2018. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 20, 2018 15 Featured Case ORDER OF REFERRAL TO DETERMINE WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/20/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
April 19, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case Reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/19/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 18, 2018 13 MOTION to Stay filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 5/2/2018. Replies due by 5/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 18, 2018 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 18, 2018 11 Summons Issued as to Cambridge Analytica LLC, Facebook, Inc. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 18, 2018 10 Featured Case Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/18/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 17, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin A. Linsley, Esq (Linsley, Kristin) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 17, 2018 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Patricia King.. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 17, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Michael Lutz for Facebook, Inc. (Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 17, 2018 6 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Orin Snyder ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12279515.) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 4/17/2018) Modified on 4/18/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Seth Lipshutz (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 17, 2018 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Patricia King (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 17, 2018 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/1/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 16, 2018 2 Proposed Summons. (Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against Cambridge Analytica LLC, Facebook, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12276398.). Filed byPatricia King. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gibbs, Eric) (Filed on 4/16/2018) Modified on 4/18/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambridge Analytica LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin A. Linsley, Esq.
Represented By: Orin Snyder
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia King
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Represented By: Andre Michel Mura
Represented By: Aaron Blumenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?