Alcaraz v. KMF Oakland LLC
Plaintiff: Bernardo Alcaraz
Defendant: KMF Oakland LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02801
Filed: May 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND DENYING DEFENDANT ALTEZZA'S MOTION TO DISMISS finding as moot 43 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; finding as moot 44 Ex Parte Application ; granting 76 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 90 Motion to Dismiss. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER RE: BOND (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER SETTING FURTHER DEADLINES (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/11/2020)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS 51 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER granting 28 Ex Parte Application. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE-SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE: SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RE-SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/7/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alcaraz v. KMF Oakland LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernardo Alcaraz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KMF Oakland LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?