Telegram Messenger Inc v. Lantah, LLC
Plaintiff: Telegram Messenger Inc
Defendant: Lantah, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02811
Filed: May 11, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part 87 Motion for Attorneys' Fees. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 79 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 80 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 69 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Telegram Messenger Inc v. Lantah, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telegram Messenger Inc
Represented By: Patrick Maben Hammon
Represented By: John M. Neukom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lantah, LLC
Represented By: Donald A. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?