Manning v. Uber Technologies Inc.
Plaintiff: Lucius Manning
Defendant: Uber Technologies Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02931
Filed: May 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 120 Stipulation of Dismissal. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 64 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY THE ACTION; DENYING AS MOOT 56 MOTION TO STAY PENDING DECISION. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE ( 81 , 89 , 92 ) MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/14/2019. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 93 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 87 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to James E. Richardson. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY; RESCHEDULING HEARINGS RE 56 MOTION to Stay and 64 MOTION to Compel: Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2019 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/13/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 68 Motion for Protective Order; granting 78 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 63 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule For Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 54 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Stay. Motions due by 10/31/2018; Responses due by 11/9/2018 and Replies due by 11/16/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 49 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manning v. Uber Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucius Manning
Represented By: David S Ratner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany Cheung
Represented By: Adam James Hunt
Represented By: Lucia X. Roibal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?