Castillo-Antonio v. Salameh

Plaintiff: Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio
Defendant: Reyad Jeries Salameh
Case Number: 3:2018cv03267
Filed: May 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 22 Stipulation Extending Deadline to Complete Mediation to February 15, 2019. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: 16 MOTION TO STRIKE. Show Cause Response due by 11/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 11/19/2018. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time Under F.R.C.P. 12(f) re 14 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on 9/18/2018. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo-Antonio v. Salameh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio
Represented By: Richard Allen Mac Bride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reyad Jeries Salameh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?