Overton v Monsanto Company Featured Case

Plaintiff alleged that he developed Non-Hodgkin's lymphoma as the result of exposure to Defendant Monsanto Company's Roundup products.

Plaintiff: Carl Overton
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv03554
Filed: June 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer A.G. for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer A.G. for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
June 15, 2018 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00748. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DJO)
June 12, 2018 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-91) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2741 by Jeffery N. Lüthi, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO)
May 15, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Kirk Goza. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. (BAK)
May 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Carl Overton Process Server: D & B Legal Services (BAK)
May 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number 0865-6539769, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Carl Overton. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Original Filing Form, # 3 Notice of Intent to Use Process Server, # 4 Summons)(Goza, Kirk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Overton v Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Overton
Represented By: Kirk John Goza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?