Chase v. Zuckerberg et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Chase
Defendant: Reed Hastings, Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L Andreessen, Peter A. Thiel, Facebook Inc., Susan Desmond-Hellmann, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Erskine B. Bowles and Christopher K. Cox
Case Number: 3:2018cv03710
Filed: June 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2018 Filing 12 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
June 21, 2018 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:18-cv-00579. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 6/22/2018 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SO ORDERED - re #9 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Transferring Case filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Christopher K. Cox, Facebook, Inc., Peter A. Thiel, Erskine B. Bowles, Jan Koum, Mark Zuckerberg, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Susan Desmond-Hellmann, Reed Hastings. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/20/2018. (mdb)
June 14, 2018 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Transferring Case by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Christopher K. Cox, Susan Desmond-Hellmann, Facebook, Inc., Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Ross, David)
May 11, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ligaya T. Hernandez for Samuel Chase added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (nmg)
May 11, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael J. Hynes for Samuel Chase added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (nmg)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #8 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint to July 6, 2018 filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Christopher K. Cox, Facebook, Inc., Peter A. Thiel, Erskine B. Bowles, Jan Koum, Mark Zuckerberg, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Susan Desmond-Hellmann, Reed Hastings, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Marc L. Andreessen answer due 7/6/2018; Erskine B. Bowles answer due 7/6/2018; Christopher K. Cox answer due 7/6/2018; Susan Desmond-Hellmann answer due 7/6/2018; Facebook, Inc. answer due 7/6/2018; Reed Hastings answer due 7/6/2018; Jan Koum answer due 7/6/2018; Sheryl K. Sandberg answer due 7/6/2018; Peter A. Thiel answer due 7/6/2018; Mark Zuckerberg answer due 7/6/2018.. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/11/2018. (mdb)
May 11, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Melissa A. Fortunato for Samuel Chase added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
May 10, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Todd H Henderson for Samuel Chase added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
May 10, 2018 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint to July 6, 2018 - filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Christopher K. Cox, Susan Desmond-Hellmann, Facebook, Inc., Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Ross, David)
May 9, 2018 DEFICIENCY NOTICE by the Court issued to defendants re #7 Stipulation to EXTEND Time: This filing does not meet Judge Sleet's requirements for such requests. The parties shall refer to Judge Sleet's requirements for filing requests to extend time on the court's website. After reviewing the procedure, the parties may RE-FILE the stipulation/motion. (mdb)
May 8, 2018 Filing 7 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint to July 6, 2018 - filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Christopher K. Cox, Susan Desmond-Hellmann, Facebook, Inc., Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Ross, David)
May 8, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David Evan Ross on behalf of Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Christopher K. Cox, Susan Desmond-Hellmann, Facebook, Inc., Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg (Ross, David)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Todd H. Henderson and Melissa A. Fortunato filed by Samuel Chase, #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Hynes and Ligaya T. Hernandez filed by Samuel Chase. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/7/2018. (mdb)
April 25, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 25, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samuel Chase. Facebook, Inc. served on 4/25/2018, answer due 5/16/2018., Return of Service Executed by Samuel Chase. Facebook, Inc. served on 4/25/2018, answer due 5/16/2018. (deLeeuw, Peter)
April 24, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Facebook, Inc. on 4/24/2018. (sar)
April 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael J. Hynes and Ligaya T. Hernandez - filed by Samuel Chase. (deLeeuw, Peter)
April 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Todd H. Henderson and Melissa A. Fortunato - filed by Samuel Chase. (deLeeuw, Peter)
April 18, 2018 No Summons Issued. (fms)
April 18, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (fms)
April 18, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED STOCKHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Christopher K. Cox, Susan Desmond-Hellmann, Facebook, Inc., Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2364425.) - filed by Samuel Chase. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(fms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chase v. Zuckerberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Hastings
Represented By: Richard Garrett Rice
Represented By: David Evan Ross
Represented By: Nicholas D. Mozal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg
Represented By: Richard Garrett Rice
Represented By: David Evan Ross
Represented By: Nicholas D. Mozal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc L Andreessen
Represented By: Richard Garrett Rice
Represented By: David Evan Ross
Represented By: Nicholas D. Mozal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A. Thiel
Represented By: Richard Garrett Rice
Represented By: David Evan Ross
Represented By: Nicholas D. Mozal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Richard Garrett Rice
Represented By: David Evan Ross
Represented By: Nicholas D. Mozal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Desmond-Hellmann
Represented By: Richard Garrett Rice
Represented By: David Evan Ross
Represented By: Nicholas D. Mozal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Koum
Represented By: Richard Garrett Rice
Represented By: David Evan Ross
Represented By: Nicholas D. Mozal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl K. Sandberg
Represented By: Richard Garrett Rice
Represented By: David Evan Ross
Represented By: Nicholas D. Mozal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erskine B. Bowles
Represented By: Richard Garrett Rice
Represented By: David Evan Ross
Represented By: Nicholas D. Mozal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher K. Cox
Represented By: Richard Garrett Rice
Represented By: David Evan Ross
Represented By: Nicholas D. Mozal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Chase
Represented By: Michael J. Hynes
Represented By: Jessica Zeldin
Represented By: Ligaya T. Hernandez
Represented By: Peter Bradford deLeeuw
Represented By: Melissa A. Fortunato
Represented By: Todd H Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?