Hong v. AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Dr. Theresa Hong
Defendant: AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv04039
Filed: July 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 1, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 35 Order, -- Defendant AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company's Counsel to Appear at Initial CMC by Telephone filed by AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 7, 2019. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER -- Stipulation for Defendant AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company's Counsel to Appear at Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone filed by AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 7, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 13 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Pleadings due by 1/3/2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION. Show Cause Response due by 10/31/2018. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 22, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Theresa Hong. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 11, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hong v. AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Misty Ann Murray
Represented By: Martin Elliot Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Theresa Hong
Represented By: Rebecca Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?