Devers v. Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund for California et al

Plaintiff: Jessica A Devers and Jessica A. Devers
Defendant: Carpenter Funds Administrative Office of Northern California, Inc. and Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund for California
Case Number: 3:2018cv04215
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
0 Judge: Edward M Chen
1 Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2018 14 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2018 at 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/27/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 23, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/23/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 22, 2018 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Carpenter Funds Administrative Office of Northern California, Inc., Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund for California.. (McDonough, Katherine) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 10 STIPULATION To Extend Answer/Response to Complaint filed by Carpenter Funds Administrative Office of Northern California, Inc., Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund for California. (McDonough, Katherine) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
July 20, 2018 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jessica A. Devers - Certification of No Reportable Interests (Creitz, Joseph) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 13, 2018 8 Summons Issued as to Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund for California. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 7 Summons Issued as to Carpenter Funds Administrative Office of Northern California, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/5/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jessica A Devers.. (Creitz, Joseph) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 3 Proposed Summons. (Creitz, Joseph) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 2 Proposed Summons. (Creitz, Joseph) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Benefits, and for Violations of the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 (ERISA) against Carpenter Funds Administrative Office of Northern California, Inc., Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund for California (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-12511186.). Filed by Jessica A Devers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Creitz, Joseph) (Filed on 7/13/2018) Modified on 7/14/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devers v. Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund for California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carpenter Funds Administrative Office of Northern California, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Ann McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund for California
Represented By: Katherine Ann McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica A Devers
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Creitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica A. Devers
Represented By: Lisa Sharon Serebin
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Creitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?