RKD Engineering Corporation, Inc. v. Nisene Technology Group, Inc.

Plaintiff: RKD Engineering Corporation, Inc.
Defendant: Nisene Technology Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv04321
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:183
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order 42 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/5/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order 38 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 37 Stipulation for Extension of Time re Docket No. 27 .(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order 36 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 32 Stipulated Protective Order.(terminating 31 Stipulation) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order 30 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 29 Stipulation Extending Time To File Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Inequitable Conduct Defense And Amend Answer Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 6-1(b). Motions due by 12/1/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RKD Engineering Corporation, Inc. v. Nisene Technology Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RKD Engineering Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Warren Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nisene Technology Group, Inc.
Represented By: Alper T. Ertas
Represented By: William Andrew Hector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?