Lopez v. Holler et al
Plaintiff: Edward Lopez
Defendant: D. Bradbury, D. Love, K. Harrington, Holler, J. Robertson, Correctional Officer D. Barneburg and B. Chaucer
Case Number: 3:2018cv04387
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: PSLC MWD
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2018 Mailed copy of docket sheet to plaintiff at PBSP. (ljf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 30, 2018 Filing 6 Letter dated 7/24/18; from Edward Lopez re In Forma Pauperis Application. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; filed by Edward Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018) Partially Modified Plaintiff's Address due to the information on his return address.
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge; by Edward Lopez. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 8/27/2018. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; filed by Edward Lopez. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT UNDER THE CIVIL RIGHTS ACT, 42 U.S.C. 1983; BENCH TRIAL DEMANDED;(NO PROCESS); (IFP PENDING); against D. Barneburg, D. Bradbury, B. Chaucer, K. Harrington, Holler, D. Love, J. Robertson. Filed byEdward Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Holler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Bradbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer D. Barneburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Chaucer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?