Baron v. Sanborn et al

Plaintiff: Riccardo Baron
Defendant: Thomas W. Casey, Carrie L. Dolan, Patty Mccord, Scott Sanborn, Simon Williams, Renaud Laplanche, Sameer Gulati, John C. Morris, John Mack, LendingClub Corporation, Steve Allocca, Dan Ciporin, Ken Denman, Timothy J. Mayopoulos and Mary Meeker
Case Number: 3:2018cv04391
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #18 STIPULATED REQUEST RE TEMPORARY STAY OF CASE (as modified). Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING AN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE UPON REASSIGNMENT - Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before the Honorable William Alsup. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order of All Judges) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on August 30, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/30/18. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 30, 2018 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING TEMPORARY STAY OF CASE filed by Steve Allocca, Thomas W. Casey, Dan Ciporin, Ken Denman, Sameer Gulati, LendingClub Corporation, John Mack, Timothy J. Mayopoulos, Patty Mccord, Mary Meeker, John C. Morris, Scott Sanborn, Simon Williams. (Talarides, Alexander) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/30/18. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/26/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2018 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on August 30, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 29, 2018 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 28, 2018 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by LendingClub Corporation.. (Talarides, Alexander) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/27/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Ann Fortunato (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David Jay Stone (Stone, David) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Todd Scott (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander K. Talarides (Talarides, Alexander) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James Neil Kramer (Kramer, James) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
July 30, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Riccardo Baron. Service waived by Steve Allocca waiver sent on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/21/2018; Thomas W. Casey waiver sent on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/21/2018; Dan Ciporin waiver sent on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/21/2018; Ken Denman waiver sent on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/21/2018; Carrie L. Dolan waiver sent on 7/24/2018, answer due 9/24/2018; Sameer Gulati waiver sent on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/21/2018; Renaud Laplanche waiver sent on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/21/2018; LendingClub Corporation waiver sent on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/21/2018; John Mack waiver sent on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/21/2018; Timothy J. Mayopoulos waiver sent on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/21/2018; Patty Mccord waiver sent on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/21/2018; Mary Meeker waiver sent on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/21/2018; John C. Morris waiver sent on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/21/2018; Scott Sanborn waiver sent on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/21/2018; Simon Williams waiver sent on 7/23/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Wagner, Avraham) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/16/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/23/2018 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Steve Allocca, Thomas W. Casey, Dan Ciporin, Ken Denman, Carrie L. Dolan, Sameer Gulati, Renaud Laplanche, LendingClub Corporation, John Mack, Timothy J. Mayopoulos, Patty Mccord, Mary Meeker, John C. Morris, Scott Sanborn, Simon Williams. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/2/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Riccardo Baron . (Wagner, Avraham) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Wagner, Avraham) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Steve Allocca, Thomas W. Casey, Dan Ciporin, Ken Denman, Carrie L. Dolan, Sameer Gulati, Renaud Laplanche, LendingClub Corporation, John Mack, Timothy J. Mayopoulos, Patty Mccord, Mary Meeker, John C. Morris, Scott Sanborn, Simon Williams ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12526987.). Filed by Riccardo Baron. (Wagner, Avraham) (Filed on 7/19/2018) Modified on 7/19/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baron v. Sanborn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas W. Casey
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Represented By: Michael Todd Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie L. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Mccord
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Represented By: Michael Todd Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Sanborn
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Represented By: Michael Todd Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Williams
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Represented By: Michael Todd Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renaud Laplanche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sameer Gulati
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Represented By: Michael Todd Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Morris
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Represented By: Michael Todd Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mack
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Represented By: Michael Todd Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LendingClub Corporation
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Represented By: Michael Todd Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Allocca
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Represented By: Michael Todd Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Ciporin
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Represented By: Michael Todd Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Denman
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Represented By: Michael Todd Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Mayopoulos
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Represented By: Michael Todd Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Meeker
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Represented By: Michael Todd Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riccardo Baron
Represented By: Melissa Ann Fortunato
Represented By: Avraham Noam Wagner
Represented By: David Jay Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?