UUSI, LLC v. APPLE, INC
Plaintiff: UUSI, LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv04637
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION For Order Requiring Plaintiff to Identify Asserted Claims Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 3-1(A) And Renewed Motion to Stay re #28 filed by Apple Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 10/4/2018. Replies due by 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bita Rahebi, #2 Exhibit A to Rahebi Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Rahebi, Bita) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2018.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/10/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 57 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 56 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by UUSI, LLC.. (Hadley, Lawrence) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 6, 2018 Filing 55 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc.. (Rahebi, Bita) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
August 6, 2018 Filing 54 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/20/2018. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
August 3, 2018 Filing 53 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for all further proceedings pursuant to Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/3/18. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 50 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/30/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2018 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 49 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-13798. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Memorandum and ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of California. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (SSch)
July 26, 2018 Filing 47 REPLY to Response re #38 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by APPLE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Declaration of Bita Rahebi, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A - Excerpt of LexisNexis Accurint Report for Norman Rautiola, #4 Exhibit B - LinkedIn Profile for Norman Rautiola, #5 Exhibit C - 2008 Michigan Tech Alumni Profile for Norman Rautiola, #6 Exhibit D - Excerpts fr May 2016 Edition of Santa Barbara Polo Magazine, #7 Exhibit E - Montecito Bd of Architectural Review Agenda, #8 Exhibit F - TotalView Sales Listing for 700 Riven Rock Rd., Sta. Barbara, CA, #9 Exhibit G - 7/8/2011 Ltr fr Byron Hourmand to the USPTO, #10 Exhibit H - Copy of Narton Corp and UUSI v. Byron Hourmand Complaint) (Rahebi, Bita)
July 17, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE OF HEARING on #38 MOTION to Transfer Case . Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2018 02:00 PM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
July 12, 2018 Filing 45 RESPONSE to #38 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Declaration of N. Rautiola, #2 Document Continuation Declaration of S. Cooper, #3 Document Continuation Declaration of P. Lee, #4 Index of Exhibits of Lee Decl., #5 Exhibit 1 Compl. Case No. 10-cv-691, #6 Exhibit 2 Consent Judgment Case No. 10-cv-691, #7 Exhibit 3 TI Website, #8 Exhibit 4 Broadcom Website, #9 Exhibit 5 Broadcom Careers Website, #10 Exhibit 6 Nartron Amended Initial Disclosures, #11 Exhibit 7 Apples Supplier Responsibility: 2018 Progress Report, #12 Exhibit 8 Apple's Amended Initial Disclosures, #13 Exhibit 9 TI Business Entity Search Result, #14 Exhibit 10 Avago Business Entity Search Result, #15 Exhibit 11 Apple Forbes List, #16 Exhibit 12 Forbes Article Re Apple, #17 Exhibit 13 LegalMetric Rpt ND Cal, #18 Exhibit 14 LegalMetric Rpt ED Mich) (Hadley, Lawrence)
July 10, 2018 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 7/25/2018 is Cancelled re #27 Notice to Appear, (MVer)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER., Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings as to #38 MOTION to Transfer Case :( Response due by 7/12/2018, Reply due by 7/26/2018) Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (DTof)
June 28, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 MOTION to Transfer Case Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Apple's Motion to Transfer by UUSI, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Huget, J.)
June 27, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE by UUSI, LLC re #29 Response to Motion Notice of Supplemental Document Supporting Nartron's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Stay (Attachments: #1 Attachment - pp 4-5 of Samsung Opening Brief) (Hadley, Lawrence)
June 25, 2018 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 7/16/2018 is Cancelled re #34 Notice of Hearing on Motion. It will be rescheduled (If necessary) after motion regarding transfer of venue is decided. (MVer)
June 25, 2018 Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motion for Clarification held on 06/21/2018. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sheri Ward, www.transcriptorders.com) (Number of Pages: 13) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 7/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2018. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Ward, S)
June 21, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 6/25/2018 10:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn Re: Motion to Transfer Venue (MVer)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REGARDING APPLE'S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION [DOC. 33]. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
June 21, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Avern Cohn: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 6/21/2018 re #33 MOTION for Clarification of the Court's Paradigm Claims Procedure filed by APPLE, INC (Court Reporter: Sheri Ward) (MVer)
June 20, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION to Transfer Case by APPLE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Brief In Support of Motion to Transfer, #2 Document Continuation Declaration of M. Jaynes, #3 Document Continuation Declaration of C. Krah, #4 Document Continuation Declaration of R. Hung, #5 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #6 Exhibit A LinkedIn profile of Byron Hourmand, #7 Exhibit B Apples amended initial disclosures, #8 Exhibit C Partial Google maps printout for Texas Instruments locations, #9 Exhibit D Broadcoms locations page, #10 Exhibit E May 16, 2018 e-mail from L. Hadley to R. Dolphin, #11 Exhibit F Google Maps printout, San Diego to N.D. California, #12 Exhibit G Google Maps printout, San Diego to E.D. Michigan, #13 Exhibit H Nartrons initial disclosures, #14 Exhibit I Nartrons About page) (Hung, Richard)
June 19, 2018 Filing 37 RESPONSE to #33 MOTION for Clarification of the Court's Paradigm Claims Procedure Nartron's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Clarification filed by UUSI, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence)
June 15, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE by UUSI, LLC Proposed Constructions for Terms and Phrases Identified by Apple (Lee, Phillip)
June 15, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 6/21/2018 10:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
June 11, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF HEARING on #28 MOTION to Stay . Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2018 10:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
June 5, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION for Clarification of the Court's Paradigm Claims Procedure by APPLE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Brief in Support of Motion for Clarification, #2 Document Continuation B. Rahebi Declaration) (Rahebi, Bita)
May 22, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE by APPLE, INC - Identification of Claim Terms for Construction (Rahebi, Bita)
May 17, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE OF HEARING on #28 MOTION to Stay . Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2018 10:30 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
May 14, 2018 Filing 30 REPLY to Response re #28 MOTION to Stay filed by APPLE, INC. (Rahebi, Bita)
May 7, 2018 Filing 29 RESPONSE to #28 MOTION to Stay Nartron's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Stay filed by UUSI, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence)
April 23, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION to Stay by APPLE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Brief In Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Document Continuation Declaration of B. Rahebi in Support of Motion to Stay, #3 Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit A - Samsung Petition, #5 Exhibit B - Decision to Institute, #6 Exhibit C - Samsung CAFC IPR Appeal, #7 Exhibit D - Nartron v. GM Dismissal Order, #8 Exhibit E - Federal Circuit Appeal flowchart) (Rahebi, Bita)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER AND NOTICE TO APPEAR: TUTORIAL HEARING set for 7/25/2018 10:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn MARKMAN HEARING set for 10/10/2018 10:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
April 12, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE by UUSI, LLC Plaintiff's Designation of Paradigm Claims (Hadley, Lawrence)
March 29, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Avern Cohn: Status Conference held on 3/29/2018. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (TMcg)
March 28, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Artz on behalf of APPLE, INC. (Artz, John)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding the Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials, Motions terminated: #21 MOTION for Protective Order Agreed Protective Order Regarding The Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials filed by UUSI, LLC. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (TMcg)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AGREED ESI STIPULATION AND ORDER re #22 Stipulation Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (TMcg)
March 20, 2018 Filing 22 STIPULATION Agreed ESI Stipulation and Order by UUSI, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Table of Metadata Fields) (Hadley, Lawrence)
March 20, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Protective Order Agreed Protective Order Regarding The Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials by UUSI, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence)[DOCUMENT IS NOT TITLED MOTION] Modified on 3/21/2018 (NAhm).
March 20, 2018 Filing 20 STATEMENT of Joint Status Conference by UUSI, LLC (Hadley, Lawrence)
February 28, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference IS RESCHEDULED for 3/29/2018 10:30 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
February 28, 2018 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 3/7/2018 is Cancelled re #12 Notice to Appear (MVer)
February 22, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence M. Hadley on behalf of UUSI, LLC. (Hadley, Lawrence)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING re #16 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney filed by APPLE, INC. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
February 15, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Erin M. Pawlowski for on behalf of APPLE, INC. (Pawlowski, Erin)
February 6, 2018 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Phillip Lee appearing on behalf of UUSI, LLC D/B/A Nartron (Lee, Phillip)
February 2, 2018 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Rose S. Lee appearing on behalf of APPLE, INC (Lee, Rose)
February 2, 2018 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bita Rahebi appearing on behalf of APPLE, INC (Rahebi, Bita)
January 25, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 3/7/2018 10:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
January 19, 2018 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by APPLE, INC identifying Corporate Parent APPLE INC. for APPLE, INC. (Quick, Daniel)
January 19, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by APPLE, INC. (Quick, Daniel)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
December 20, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel D. Quick on behalf of APPLE, INC. (Quick, Daniel)
December 20, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin M. Pawlowski on behalf of APPLE, INC. (Pawlowski, Erin)
November 29, 2017 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. APPLE, INC served on 11/29/2017, answer due 12/20/2017. (Huget, J.)
November 27, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Waidelich on behalf of UUSI, LLC. (Waidelich, Sarah)
November 22, 2017 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
November 22, 2017 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *APPLE, INC* (DWor)
November 22, 2017 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by UUSI, LLC (Huget, J.)
November 22, 2017 Filing 2 Patent Report Sent To Washington (Huget, J.)
November 22, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by UUSI, LLC against APPLE, INC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6490390 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: out of state. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. U.S. Patent 5,796,183) (Huget, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UUSI, LLC v. APPLE, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Daniel D. Quick,
Represented By: Erin M. Pawlowski
Represented By: Bita Rahebi
Represented By: John S. Artz
Represented By: Richard S.J. Hung
Represented By: Rose S Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UUSI, LLC
Represented By: Sarah E. Waidelich
Represented By: Lawrence M. Hadley
Represented By: Phillip Lee
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?