Tully v. Davis
Defendant: Warden Ron Davis
Petitioner: Richard Tully
Undetermined: Habeas Capital Notification
Case Number: 3:2018cv04763
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: DPLC ALL
Referring Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Attorney James Scott Thomson and Co-Counsel Marcia Ann Morrissey for Richard Tully added. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/13/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON ORDER RE:REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AND STAY OF EXECUTION (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE RE: ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AND STAY OF EXECUTION. (See Docket #8 for certificate of service attachment) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018) Modified on 8/9/2018 (bpfS, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OFCOUNSEL AND STAY OF EXECUTION. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/8/18. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Filing of New Death Penalty Action. (This is a text-only entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Richard Tully . (Schlesinger, Joseph) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Richard Tully. (Schlesinger, Joseph) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Stay of Execution; REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel , Declaration in Support, and Proposed Order. Filed by Richard Tully. (Schlesinger, Joseph) (Filed on 8/7/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tully v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Tully
Represented By: Joseph Schlesinger
Represented By: Marcia Ann Morrissey
Represented By: James Scott Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Ron Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Habeas Capital Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?