Fremont Bank v. Signorelli et al

Plaintiff: Fremont Bank
Defendant: Robert J Signorelli, Kathryn R Signorelli and Singorelli Family, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2018cv04808
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Fremont Bank against Singorelli Family, L.P., Kathryn R Signorelli, Robert J Signorelli. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Close of Fact Discovery due by 3/11/2019; Opening Reports due by 3/18/2019; Rebuttal Reports due by 3/25/2019; Close of Expert Discovery due by 4/19/2019; Pretrial Conference set for 6/1 1/2019 03:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Jury Selection /Jury Trial (2-day) set for 6/24/2019 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (This order terminates 30 Stipulation).(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT RESCIND OR MODIFY WRITS OF ATTACHMENT.Show Cause Response due by 1/11/2019. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/10/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 WRIT of Attachment issued as to Robert J. Signorelli, Signorelli Family L.P., and Signorelli Family Living Trust with copy of order # 37 attached. (Original writ mailed to submitting party). (Attachments: # 1 Writ issued as to Signorelli Family, L.P., # 2 Writ issued as to Signorelly Family Living Trust, # 3 Copy of Order)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 35 RENEWED APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND WRIT OF ATTACHMENT. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 13 APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND WRIT OF ATTACHMENT.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 13 MOTION for Right to Attach Order, Issuance of Writ of Attachment, and Temporary Protective Order Against Defendants Robert J. Signorelli, Kathryn R. Signorelli, Signorelli Family Living Trust, and Signorelli Family, L.P. : Responses due by 10/22/2018 and Replies due by 10/29/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fremont Bank v. Signorelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fremont Bank
Represented By: Kristin Louise Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Signorelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn R Signorelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singorelli Family, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?