Duran v. Santa Clara County
Plaintiff: Maria A. Duran
Defendant: Santa Clara County
Case Number: 3:2018cv04832
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Filing 11 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Judge Charles R. Breyer. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Maria A. Duran.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Re: ECF #1 , #2 . An amended IFP application or court filing fee payment is due 9/12/2018. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/27/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 8/10/18. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/10/18. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 11 /6/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2018 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Maria A. Duran. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no process) IFP against Santa Clara County. Filed byMaria A. Duran. Consent/Declination due by 8/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Notice of right to sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duran v. Santa Clara County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria A. Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Clara County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?