Perez v. Binkele et al
Plaintiff: Matthew R. Perez
Defendant: Jeffrey H. Bass, A. Franco, J. Peffley, R. Salgado, R. Binkele, E. Moore and Nurse at Natividad Medical Center
Case Number: 3:2018cv04856
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Referring Judge: PSLC CLA
2 Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
3 Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 Letter from Matthew Perez requesting materials. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings pursuant to pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment to a U.S. District Court Judge. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 9/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge and CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Matthew R. Perez. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Matthew R. Perez. (Attachments: #1 certificate of funds)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffrey H. Bass, R. Binkele, A. Franco, E. Moore, Nurse at Natividad Medical Center, J. Peffley, R. Salgado. Filed by Matthew R. Perez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Binkele et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey H. Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Peffley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Salgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Binkele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse at Natividad Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew R. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?