Isaacs v. Musk et al
Plaintiff: Kalman Isaacs
Defendant: Elon Musk and Tesla, Inc.
Petitioner: Carlos Maia
Case Number: 3:2018cv04865
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #36 Stipulation.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Related Case Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #35 Motion to Relate Case. Related case: 18-cv-5899-RS. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. re #35 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related, #36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #35 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #35 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting (31) Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaints and Comtinuing Case Management Conference and Associated Deadlines in case 3:18-cv-04865-EMC.Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-04865-EMC, 3:18-cv-04876-EMC, 3:18-cv-04912-EMC, 3:18-cv-04939-EMC, 3:18-cv-04948-EMC, 3:18-cv-05258-EMC, 3:18-cv-05463-EMC, 3:18-cv-05470-EMC(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Application for Refund re #27 Refund Status, #32 Refund Status, #30 Application for Refund, #25 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 12586757 SECOND AMENDED by Kalman Isaacs. (George, Eric) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Refund Status re #30 Application for Refund DECLINED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, 29 Clerk's Notice, #4 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC Class Action,, #13 Waiver of Service Executed Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Extending Time For Defendants To Respond To Complaints And Continuing Case Management Conference And Associated Deadlines filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Application for Refund re #27 Refund Status, #25 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 12586757 AMENDED APPLICATION by Kalman Isaacs. (George, Eric) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE: Due to the Court's unavailability, the Initial Case Management Conference is advanced from 11/8/2018 to 11/5/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint CMC Statement due date remains unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED Clerk's Notice DECLINING Video Recording re: (16 in 3:18-cv-04912-EMC, 15 in 3:18-cv-04948-EMC, 15 in 3:18-cv-05470-EMC, 18 in 3:18-cv-05463-EMC, 16 in 3:18-cv-04939-EMC, 18 in 3:18-cv-05258-EMC, 16 in 3:18-cv-04876-EMC, 24 in 3:18-cv-04865-EMC) re Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Refund Status re #25 Application for Refund DECLINED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Clerk's Notice CONSENTING TO Video Recording re: (16 in 3:18-cv-04912-EMC, 15 in 3:18-cv-04948-EMC, 15 in 3:18-cv-05470-EMC, 18 in 3:18-cv-05463-EMC, 16 in 3:18-cv-04939-EMC, 18 in 3:18-cv-05258-EMC, 16 in 3:18-cv-04876-EMC, 24 in 3:18-cv-04865-EMC) Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-12586830 by Kalman Isaacs. (George, Eric) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. Video Camera hearing set for 11/8/2018 09:30 AM. Objections to Video Recording due 9/21/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RELATED CASE ORDER relating the following cases: 18-cv-4876-JST, 18-cv-4912-CRB, 18-cv-4939-EMC, 18-cv-4948-HSG, 18-cv-5258-LHK, 18-cv-5463-VC, and 18-cv-5470-YGR. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/12/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #19 Stipulation Re Administrative Motion to Relate Cases. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 18-cv-05463-VC. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/12/2018. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. re #19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #18 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion To Relate Cases; Response To Sua Sponte Judicial Referral , #18 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion To Relate Cases; Response To Sua Sponte Judicial Referral Proof of Service (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #18 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion To Relate Cases; Response To Sua Sponte Judicial Referral filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion To Relate Cases; Response To Sua Sponte Judicial Referral filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/5/2018. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean S. Kristy Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Kristy, Dean) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE by Kalman Isaacs of Filing and Service of Notice Required by the PSLRA (Local Rule 23-1(a)) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice)(Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kalman Isaacs. Service waived by Elon Musk waiver sent on 8/16/2018, answer due 10/15/2018; Tesla, Inc. waiver sent on 8/16/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Roth, Carl) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/28/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RELATING CASE: #6 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Carlos Maia. Case related: 18-cv-4939-LHK. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/28/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12600458.) filed by Kalman Isaacs. (Keller, Ashley) (Filed on 8/16/2018) Modified on 8/17/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12600412.) filed by Kalman Isaacs. (Ottensoser, Uri) (Filed on 8/16/2018) Modified on 8/17/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Carlos Maia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Choi, Mario) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION: SEC Class Action Notice due by 8/31/2018. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (George, Eric) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12586830). Filed by Kalman Isaacs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(George, Eric) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/14/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isaacs v. Musk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalman Isaacs
Represented By: Eric Marc George
Represented By: Uri Seth Ottensoser
Represented By: Carl Alan Roth
Represented By: Ashley Conrad Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elon Musk
Represented By: Dean S. Kristy
Represented By: Mara Rachelle Ludmer
Represented By: Jennifer Corinne Bretan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla, Inc.
Represented By: Dean S. Kristy
Represented By: Mara Rachelle Ludmer
Represented By: Jennifer Corinne Bretan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carlos Maia
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?