Bolin v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Paul C. Bolin
Defendant: Heather E. Williams, Brian Abbington and Robert D. Bacon
Case Number: 3:2018cv04937
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: PSLC LLH
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/14/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/14/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Paul C. Bolin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 9/21/2018. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian Abbington, Robert D. Bacon, Heather E. Williams. (IFPP) No Process. Filed byPaul C. Bolin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bolin v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul C. Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather E. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Abbington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?