Freeman v. CDCR DVI
Plaintiff: Ronald Freeman
Defendant: CDCR DVI
Case Number: 3:2018cv05010
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Referring Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Corrected plaintiff's CDCR# on docket (from BE1134) and remailed Order of Transfer to plaintiff at DVI. Enclosed copy of docket sheet.(ljf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 Mail sent to Ronald Freeman returned as undeliverable re #4 Order Transferring Case. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 7, 2018 Receipt from USDC- Eastern California. The case number is 18-2438. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/4/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ronald Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 9/24/2018. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CDCR DVI (Filing fee $ 400-ifpp). Filed byRonald Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. CDCR DVI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR DVI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?