United States of America v. One Springfield XD .40 Caliber Handgun SN: XD469962; and other items

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One Springfield XD .40 caliber handgun SN: XD469962; and other items
Case Number: 3:2018cv05029
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by United States of America of re #12 Service by Publication (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 09/22/18 - Proof of Publication of Notice of Forfeiture Action (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #10 Case Assigned/Reassigned, (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #8 Order Relating Case (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 4, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #3 Case Management Scheduling Order, #1 Complaint, #6 Warrant Issued, #4 Notice (Other), #5 Proposed Warrant (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 Warrant Issued as to One Springfield XD.40 Caliber Handgun SN: XD469962; and other items (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America (Notice of Forfeiture Action) (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2018 02:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Susan Illston on 8/17/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem; (NO PROCESS); (FEE WAIVED) against One Springfield XD.40 Caliber Handgun SN: XD469962; and other items. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 8/16/2018) Modified on 8/17/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One Springfield XD .40 Caliber Handgun SN: XD469962; and other items
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Springfield XD .40 caliber handgun SN: XD469962; and other items
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Karen D. Beausey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?