Ponten Spirit Holding AB, et al v. Automile, Inc

Plaintiff: PONTN SPIRIT HOLDING AB, Jacob Pontn, Ponten Spirit Holding AB and Jacob Ponten
Defendant: AUTOMILE INC. and Automile, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv05096
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 19 CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are hereby notified that the Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 11/27/2018 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The case management conference statement is now due by 11/20/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 12, 2018 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) filed byJacob Ponten, Ponten Spirit Holding AB. (Shi, Qin) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 10, 2018 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Huttinger (Huttinger, Henry) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 2, 2018 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Automile, Inc... (Au, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 1, 2018 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Automile, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Dawn Capital II B LP, Other Affiliate Dawn Capital II LP, Other Affiliate Ehn Holding AB, Other Affiliate Eric Yuan, Other Affiliate Ersun Family Trust, Other Affiliate F3R Consulting AB, Other Affiliate Hamble Investment Holdings Ltd, Other Affiliate Herve Soursou, Other Affiliate Insight Venture Partners (Cayman) IX, L.P., Other Affiliate Insight Venture Partners (Delaware) IX, L.P., Other Affiliate Insight Venture Partners IX (Co-Investors), L.P., Other Affiliate Insight Venture Partners IX, L.P., Other Affiliate Ludwig Bolling, Other Affiliate Martin Nordmark, Other Affiliate Nathaniel Justin Kan Revocable Trust, Other Affiliate Nurmi Drive AB, Other Affiliate Panterlo AB, Other Affiliate Point Nine Capital Fund III GmbH & Co KG, Other Affiliate Point Nine Co-Invest III GmbH & Co. KG, Other Affiliate Ponten Spirit Holdings AB, Other Affiliate Renevatio AB, Other Affiliate Salesforce Ventures LLC, Other Affiliate The SaaStr Fund I, L.P., Other Affiliate The SaaStr Opportunity Fund I, L.P., Other Affiliate Tiago Paiva for Automile, Inc., Automile, Inc.. (Au, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 28, 2018 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #13 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Automile, In c. Parent Corporations & Other Affiliates Must be Added When Prompted. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Automile, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 10/12/2018. Replies due by 10/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ragesh K. Tangri, #2 Exhibit A to the declaration of Ragesh K. Tangri, #3 Proposed Order)(Tangri, Ragesh) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 13 ERRONEOUSL E-FILED: PLEASE SEE ERROR MESSAGE DATED 09/28/18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Automile, Inc. (Au, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 10/1/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2018 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand ;, COUNTERCLAIM against Jacob Ponten, Ponten Spirit Holding AB byAutomile, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Au, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 10/1/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2018 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Automile, Inc.. (Horgan-Kobelski, Timothy) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Patrick Horgan-Kobelski (Horgan-Kobelski, Timothy) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin B. Au (Au, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ragesh K. Tangri (Tangri, Ragesh) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
August 31, 2018 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jacob Ponten, Ponten Spirit Holding AB.. (Shi, Qin) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 28, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jacob Ponten, Ponten Spirit Holding AB POS by Plaintiffs (Shi, Qin) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 21, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Automile, Inc.(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/21/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 21, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Duplicate entry. [err103]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #3 Proposed Summons filed by Ponten Spirit Holding AB, Jaco b Ponten (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 21, 2018 3 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: DUPLICATIVE OF DOCKET NUMBER #1 (Part 3) Proposed Summons. (Shi, Qin) (Filed on 8/21/2018) Modified on 8/21/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2018 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/4/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 20, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by PONTN SPIRIT HOLDING AB, Jacob Pontn Parties Can Not be Entered with all Capitalized Letters. Parties Mispelled (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 1 COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT, BREACH OF THE COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING, INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH PROSPECTIVE ECONOMIC ADVANTAGE, AND FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; JURY DEMANDED: By Ponten Spirit Holding AB and Jacob Ponten against AUTOMILE INC.Receipt # 0971-12609391 , $400.00 Fee Paid. Filed by Ponten Spirit Holding AB, Jacob Ponten. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit to Complaint: Co-Sale Agreement, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Appendix Cert of Interested Parties)(Shi, Qin) (Filed on 8/20/2018) Modified on 8/20/2018 (fff, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/21/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ponten Spirit Holding AB, et al v. Automile, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTOMILE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automile, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin B. Au
Represented By: Ragesh K. Tangri
Represented By: W. Henry Huttinger
Represented By: Timothy Patrick Horgan-Kobelski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PONTN SPIRIT HOLDING AB
Represented By: Qin Shi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Pontn
Represented By: Qin Shi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ponten Spirit Holding AB
Represented By: Qin Shi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Ponten
Represented By: Qin Shi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?