City and County of San Francisco v. Jefferson B. Sessions, III et al
Plaintiff: City and County of San Francisco
Defendant: Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Laura L. Rogers, United States Department of Justice and Matt M. Dummermuth
Case Number: 3:2018cv05146
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick granting (18) Stipulation in case 3:18-cv-05146-WHO and (15) Stipulation in case 3:18-cv-05169-WHO. Plaintiffs shall have until November 1, 2018 to file an amended complaint in this action. Defendants' responses to the complaints shall be due on December 3, 2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 16, 2018 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order on Amendment of Complaints and Defendants' Responses to Amended Complaints filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, filed by Jefferson B. Sessions, III, United States Department of Justice, Matt M. Dummermuth. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of W. Scott Simpson, #2 Proposed Order)(Simpson, W.) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City and County of San Francisco Updated Proof of Service (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City and County of San Francisco Proof of Service (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 11/27/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 11/20/2018. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/11/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 13 Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RELATING CASE - This matter is found to be related to 3:17cv485-WHO. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/10/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City and County of San Francisco.. (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City and County of San Francisco Proof of Service (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara M. Steeley Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Steeley, Tara) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Jennifer Eisenberg Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Yvonne Rosil Mere Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Mere, Yvonne) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald P. Flynn Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Laura L. Rogers, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, United States Department of Justice. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/5/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Herrera, Dennis) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-12617782.). Filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Herrera, Dennis) (Filed on 8/22/2018) Modified on 8/22/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City and County of San Francisco v. Jefferson B. Sessions, III et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Dennis J. Herrera
Represented By: Ronald P. Flynn
Represented By: Tara M. Steeley
Represented By: Sara Jennifer Eisenberg
Represented By: Yvonne Rosil Mere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson B. Sessions, III
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura L. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt M. Dummermuth
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?