Rankins v. Facebook, Inc.,
Plaintiff: Velma Serina Rankins and Susan Hwang
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.,
Interested Party: Janice Vega-Latker, Anthony Bell, Taunna Jarvimaki, Tyoka Brumfield, Cheryl Senko, Steven Akins, JOHN DOE, Gretchen Maxwell, Mitchell Staggs, Ian Miller, Brendan Michael Carr, Scott McDonnell, Olivia Johnston, Bridget Peters, Ashley Kmieciak, James Tronka, Jordan O'Hara, Charnae Tutt, Tonya Smith, Tabielle Holsinger, Wendy Burnett, Sandra Adkins, Juliana Watson, Tyler King, Harold Nyanjom, Mary Beth Grisi, Suzie Haslinger, Jason Ariciu, Barbara Vance-Guerbe, Lawrence Olin, Bridgett Burk, Anthony Williams, Dustin Short, William Lloyd, Paige Grays, Terry Fischer, Scott Schinder, Shelly Forman, Sheron Smith-Jackson and Kimberly Robertson
Case Number: 3:2018cv05350
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASES 18-01881 RS, 18-5350 VC, 18-05357 JSW. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/9/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO RELATE CASES RE Case Nos. 18-md-02843-VC, 18-cv-05350-VC, 18-cv-05357-JSW. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/9/2018. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel ) filed byAnthony Williams, Tyoka Brumfield, Wendy Burnett, Lawrence Olin, Harold Nyanjom, Sheron Smith-Jackson, Janice Vega-Latker. (Fisher, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel ) OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL filed bySandra Adkins, Steven Akins, Jason Ariciu, Anthony Bell, Bridgett Burk, Brendan Michael Carr, JOHN DOE, Terry Fischer, Shelly Forman, Paige Grays, Mary Beth Grisi, Suzie Haslinger, Tabielle Holsinger, Taunna Jarvimaki, Olivia Johnston, Tyler King, Ashley Kmieciak, William Lloyd, Gretchen Maxwell, Scott McDonnell, Ian Miller, Jordan O'Hara, Bridget Peters, Kimberly Robertson, Scott Schinder, Cheryl Senko, Dustin Short, Tonya Smith, Mitchell Staggs, James Tronka, Charnae Tutt, Barbara Vance-Guerbe, Juliana Watson. (Loeser, Derek) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek William Loeser NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PLAINTIFFS IN THE IN RE: FACEBOOK, INC. CONSUMER PRIVACY USER PROFILE LITIGATION (Loeser, Derek) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel filed by Velma Serina Rankins. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 10/5/2018. Replies due by 10/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sabita Soneji in Support of Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel, #2 Declaration Declaration of John Yanchunis in Support of Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel)(Soneji, Sabita) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 15 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Susan Hwang. Responses due by 9/17/2018. (Watson, Joshua) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extending Time to Respond filed by Facebook, Inc.,. (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Seth Lipshutz (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin A. Linsley, Esq (Linsley, Kristin) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Michael Lutz (Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Velma Serina Rankins. Facebook, Inc., served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (Soneji, Sabita) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on September 4, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 ***DISREGARD, PDF ERROR, SEE DOCKET ENRTY 9*** ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on September 4, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018) Modified on 9/4/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Velma Serina Rankins.. (Soneji, Sabita) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc.(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/13/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Soneji, Sabita) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12640472.). Filed byVelma Serina Rankins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Soneji, Sabita) (Filed on 8/30/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rankins v. Facebook, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velma Serina Rankins
Represented By: Sabita J. Soneji
Represented By: Tanya Susan Koshy
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Hwang
Represented By: Joshua Haakon Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.,
Represented By: Kristin A. Linsley, Esq.
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Janice Vega-Latker
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Anthony Bell
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Taunna Jarvimaki
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Tyoka Brumfield
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Cheryl Senko
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Steven Akins
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JOHN DOE
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Gretchen Maxwell
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Mitchell Staggs
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ian Miller
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Brendan Michael Carr
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Scott McDonnell
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Olivia Johnston
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bridget Peters
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ashley Kmieciak
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: James Tronka
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jordan O'Hara
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Charnae Tutt
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Tonya Smith
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Tabielle Holsinger
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Wendy Burnett
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Sandra Adkins
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Juliana Watson
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Tyler King
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Harold Nyanjom
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Mary Beth Grisi
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Suzie Haslinger
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jason Ariciu
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Barbara Vance-Guerbe
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Lawrence Olin
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bridgett Burk
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Anthony Williams
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Dustin Short
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: William Lloyd
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Paige Grays
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Terry Fischer
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Scott Schinder
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelly Forman
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Sheron Smith-Jackson
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Kimberly Robertson
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?