United States of America, for the use and benefit of JKP, Inc. v. Pre Con Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America, for the use and benefit of JKP, Inc.
Defendant: Pre Con Industries, Inc. and United Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv05388
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Referring Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service served on Pre Con Industries, Inc. on 09/24/2018, filed by United States of America, for the use and benefit of JKP, Inc.., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America, for the use and benefit of JKP, Inc. (Stepans, Edward) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by United States of America, for the use and benefit of JKP, Inc. FRCP 7.1 Disclosure Stmt (Stepans, Edward) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America, for the use and benefit of JKP, Inc... (Stepans, Edward) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE directing Plaintiff(s) to file consent or declination to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction:Plaintiffs Consent or Declination was due 9/14/2018, it was not received by the Court. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a Magistrate Judge no later than 9/28/2018. Note: Any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case Reassigned to Judge Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 09/04/2018. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Pre Con Industries, Inc., United Fire & Casualty Company. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/18) Modified on 9/4/2018 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/14/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT on Miller Act Payment Bond against Pre Con Industries, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12644796.). Filed byUnited States of America, for the use and benefit of JKP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Complaint on Miller Act Payment Bond, #2 Exhibit to Complaint on Miller Act Payment Bond, #3 Summons to Complaint on Miller Act Payment Bond, #4 Civil Cover Sheet to Complaint on Miller Act Payment Bond)(Stepans, Edward) (Filed on 8/31/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America, for the use and benefit of JKP, Inc. v. Pre Con Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pre Con Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America, for the use and benefit of JKP, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Reinis Stepans
Represented By: Jonathan James Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?