Frankel et al v. Bob's Red Mill Natural Foods, Inc.

Plaintiff: Natasha Paracha, Tamara Frankel and Paul Davis
Defendant: Bob's Red Mill Natural Foods, Inc and Bob's Red Mill Natural Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv05394
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
0 Judge: Joseph C Spero
1 Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 24 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons [Civ.L.R. 3-15] filed by Bob's Red Mill Natural Foods, Inc (Biderman, David) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 24, 2018 23 First Amended Class Action Complaint against Bob's Red Mill Natural Foods, Inc. Filed by Tamara Frankel, Natasha Paracha. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A)(Syverson, Patricia) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order 22 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MICA D. KLEIN PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order 21 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CHARLES C. SIPOS PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 2, 2018 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12730445) filed by Bob's Red Mill Natural Foods, Inc. (Klein, Mica) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12730357) filed by Bob's Red Mill Natural Foods, Inc. (Sipos, Charles) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Bob's Red Mill Natural Foods, Inc. (Biderman, David) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order 17 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ELAINE RYAN PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order 16 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CARRIE ANN LALIBERTE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 20, 2018 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12696848) filed by Tamara Frankel, Natasha Paracha. (Ryan, Elaine) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 20, 2018 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12696830) filed by Tamara Frankel, Natasha Paracha. (Laliberte, Carrie) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 19, 2018 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Tamara Frankel, Natasha Paracha. Service waived by Bob's Red Mill Natural Foods, Inc waiver sent on 9/18/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Syverson, Patricia) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY STEWART M. WELTMAN PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12681293) filed by Tamara Frankel, Natasha Paracha. (Weltman, Stewart) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 9/14/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 13, 2018 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 12, 2018 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tamara Frankel, Natasha Paracha.. (Syverson, Patricia) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 5, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to Bob's Red Mill Natural Foods, Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
August 31, 2018 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Tamara Frankel, Natasha Paracha re: #1 Complaint filed by Natasha Paracha, Tamara Frankel. (Syverson, Patricia) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to Judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used when filing initial documents of (JS-CAND 44 (Rev 12/12) CAND rev (1/1 5/13)). Please complete current Civil Cover Sheet of JS-CAND-44 (Rev. 06/17) and re-file as separate docket entry re: #1 Complaint, filed by Natasha Paracha, Tamara Frankel (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/14/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 2 Proposed Summons. (Syverson, Patricia) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 31, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Bob's Red Mill Natural Foods, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12645529). Filed by Tamara Frankel, Natasha Paracha. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Syverson, Patricia) (Filed on 8/31/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frankel et al v. Bob's Red Mill Natural Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Paracha
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Stewart M. Weltman
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Frankel
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Stewart M. Weltman
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Davis
Represented By: Stewart M. Weltman
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob's Red Mill Natural Foods, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob's Red Mill Natural Foods, Inc.
Represented By: David T. Biderman
Represented By: Charles Christian Sipos
Represented By: Mica Dawn Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?