Hitler v. Defendants in U.S. Federal Case No. 05656 SBA, et al
Petitioner: Carl A.R. Hitler, Jr.
Respondent: People of the United States, United Nations and Defendants in U.S. Federal Case No. 05656 SBA
Case Number: 3:2018cv05417
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC MWD
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/25/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/25/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
September 7, 2018 Added "aka" to plaintiff address field.(ljf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/12/2018. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus. Filed byCarl A.R. Hitler, Jr. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hitler v. Defendants in U.S. Federal Case No. 05656 SBA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Defendants in U.S. Federal Case No. 05656 SBA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carl A.R. Hitler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?