Elder v. Fosubo, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kevin Elder
Defendant: Fosubo, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv05583
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
0 Judge: Laurel Beeler
1 Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2018 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kevin Elder. Service waived by Kevin Elder waiver sent on 9/13/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Leventhal, Joseph) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 2, 2018 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kevin Elder with Certificate of Service (Echevestre, Nicolas) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicolas Joshua Echevestre with Certificate of Service (Echevestre, Nicolas) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
September 18, 2018 7 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 17, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 9/17/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 14, 2018 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 13, 2018 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kevin Elder.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Leventhal, Joseph) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 12, 2018 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Fosubo, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12672466.). Filed byKevin Elder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Leventhal, Joseph) (Filed on 9/12/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elder v. Fosubo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fosubo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Elder
Represented By: Joseph Samuel Leventhal
Represented By: Nicolas Joshua Echevestre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?