G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Rodriguez et al

Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Defendant: Luz Maria Rodriguez, Edgar Ivan Rodriguez, La Placita Mexicatessen, LLC and Victor Herrera Juarez
Case Number: 3:2018cv05609
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case Reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/26/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC.. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Victor Herrera Juarez. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Luz Maria Rodriguez. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to La Placita Mexicatessen, LLC. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Edgar Ivan Rodriguez. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-12675632.). Filed by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 9/13/2018) Modified on 9/19/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Rodriguez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luz Maria Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Ivan Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Placita Mexicatessen, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Herrera Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?