U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Cooking Round the World, Inc.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC) and U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Cooking Round the World, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv05880
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/30/2018. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission Consent to Assignment of Magistrate Judge (Smith, Debra) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 1/8/2019 at 3:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cooking Round the World, Inc. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due b y 1/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/25/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC) Plaintiff Party Entered Incorrectly. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/9/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Smith, Debra) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED; against Cooking Round the World, Inc. Filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Debra) (Filed on 9/25/2018) Modified on 9/26/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Cooking Round the World, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC)
Represented By: Debra A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Debra A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooking Round the World, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?