Lee v. Ticketmaster L.L.C. et al Featured Case

A class action lawsuit filed against Ticketmaster and its parent company Live Nation Entertainment alleging Ticketmaster secretly helps ticket scalpers.

Plaintiff: Allen Lee
Defendant: Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. and Ticketmaster L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2018cv05987
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order as Modified by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #22 Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Case Management Conference.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #21 Stipulation Regarding #20 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related. Cases 18-cv-5987-VC, Lee v. Ticketmaster L.L.C. et al., and 18-cv-6750-JD, Ameri v. Ticketmaster LLC. are related. The Ameri case is ordered transferred to Judge Chhabria.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy L. O'Mara)(O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding #20 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related) filed by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 12, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Christopher B. Campbell, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 11/12/2018)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #17 Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/5/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 18 Declaration of Timothy L. O'Mara in Support of #17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Case Management Conference filed byLive Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (Related document(s) #17 ) (O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint) filed by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Media Corporation for Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Media Corporation for Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L. O'Mara on behalf of Defendants Ticketmaster LLC and Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. (O'Mara, Timothy) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Murray Wall on behalf of Defendants Ticketmaster LLC and Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. (Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Berman.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12735908.) filed by Allen Lee. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 1/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/2/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Allen Lee.. (Byszewski, Elaine) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/1/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/15/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Byszewski, Elaine) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12722202.). Filed byAllen Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Byszewski, Elaine) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 10/1/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12722202.). Filed byAllen Lee. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Byszewski, Elaine) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 10/1/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Ticketmaster L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Lee
Represented By: Elaine T. Byszewski
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy L. O'Mara
Represented By: Daniel Murray Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ticketmaster L.L.C.
Represented By: Timothy L. O'Mara
Represented By: Daniel Murray Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?