Lukowski v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust et al
Plaintiff: Scott Alan Lukowski
Defendant: LSF9 Master Participation Trust and U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Case Number: 3:2018cv06298
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Robert M Illman
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 23 Declaration of Randall Naiman in Support of #21 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byU.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-4)(Related document(s) #21 ) (Kress, Lindsey) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 22 Declaration of Ryan Bennett in Support of #21 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byU.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-7)(Related document(s) #21 ) (Kress, Lindsey) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 MOTION to Remand ) filed byU.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Kress, Lindsey) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 20 REPLY (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byU.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Kress, Lindsey) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Scott Alan Lukowski re #18 Opposition/Response to Motion (Stunich, Andrew) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss ) Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byScott Alan Lukowski. (Stunich, Andrew) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTIONS HEARING. Continuing Motions Hearing as to #15 MOTION to Remand #9 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion to Dismiss Hearing previously set for 11/29/2018 has been continued to 1/17/2019 at 01:30 PM. Motion to Remand previously set for 12/27/2018 has been continued to 1/17/2019 at 1:30 pm in Courtroom #3, 17th Floor, Before Judge Ricahrd Seeborg. All filing deadlines remain the same. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Scott Alan Lukowski re #15 MOTION to Remand (Stunich, Andrew) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand filed by Scott Alan Lukowski. Motion Hearing set for 12/27/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 11/27/2018. Replies due by 12/4/2018. (Stunich, Andrew) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
October 23, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 14 Renotice motion hearing re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed byU.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Kress, Lindsey) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All pending motions will be taken off-calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing according to Judge Seeborg's available dates, which are listed on his webpage under the section "Scheduling Notes." The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. Case Management Statement due by 1/17/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/23/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 Request for Judicial Notice re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed byU.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-10)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Kress, Lindsey) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. Motion Hearing set for 11/27/2018 10:00 AM in McKinleyville before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Responses due by 11/5/2018. Replies due by 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kress, Lindsey) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust.. (Kress, Lindsey) (Filed on 10/18/2018)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Regina Jill McClendon (McClendon, Regina) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust re #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Kress, Lindsey) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2019 02:00 PM in McKinleyville. Parties may participate in the Initial Case Management Conference by telephone and should contact Judge Illman's courtroom deputy for instructions. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust re #1 Certificate of Interested Entities, #2 Notice of Removal, (Kress, Lindsey) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/29/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Agency Tracking ID: 0971-12763215 from Humboldt County Superior Court. Their case number is DR170576. (). Filed byU.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kress, Lindsey) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 Certificate of Interested Entities by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp, Corporate Parent LSF9 Master Participation Trust for U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Kress, Lindsey) (Filed on 10/15/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lukowski v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Lindsey Elizabeth Kress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Lindsey Elizabeth Kress
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Alan Lukowski
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Stunich, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?