Center for Food Safety et al v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: Center for Environmental Health and Center for Food Safety
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II, Health and Human Services, Department of, Scott Gottlieb and U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 3:2018cv06299
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety (Attachments: #1 Exhibit of Receipts Verifying Service)(Talbott, Ryan) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety.. (Talbott, Ryan) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #7 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #6 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar, II, Scott Gottlieb, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2019 03:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/15/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Center for Food Safety, Center for Environmental Health Entered Defendant Party Incorrectly (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Ryan D. Talbott ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12764243.) filed by Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety. (Talbott, Ryan) (Filed on 10/15/2018) Modified on 10/16/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for George A. Kimbrell ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12764180.) filed by Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety. (Kimbrell, George) (Filed on 10/15/2018) Modified on 10/16/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety (Smith, Kellan) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/29/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Center for Environmental Health, Center for Food Safety (Smith, Kellan) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Smith, Kellan) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND EQUITABLE RELIEF ; ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE ACT CASE; against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12763225.). Filed byCenter for Food Safety, Center for Environmental Health. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Kellan) (Filed on 10/15/2018) Modified on 10/16/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Food Safety et al v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Environmental Health
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Represented By: Kellan Richard Smith
Represented By: Ryan D Talbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Food Safety
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Represented By: Kellan Richard Smith
Represented By: Ryan D Talbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health and Human Services, Department of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?