Smith v. United Continental Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: DeBorah Smith
Defendant: United Continental Holdings, Inc., United Airlines, Inc. and Taneka Gibson
Case Number: 3:2018cv06360
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 19 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/3/2018 11:08:22 AM ]. File Size [ 4728 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:09:51 ]. (courtspeak).
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING IMPROPER JOINDER AND RESERVING RULING ON DECISION TO REMAND. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 12/3/2018. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
December 3, 2018 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2018 re #10 First MOTION to Remand . The Court will issue a written order. (FTR Time: 11:08-11:18.) Attorney for Plaintiff: David Kleczek. Attorney for Defendants: Richard Grotch. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/3/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint filed by United Airlines, Inc.. (Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY (re #10 First MOTION to Remand ) filed byDeBorah Smith. (Kleczek, David) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 14 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 First MOTION to Remand ) filed byUnited Airlines, Inc., United Continental Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Taneka Gibson, #2 Declaration of Richard G. Grotch)(Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff has filed an amended complaint. Therefore, the pending Motion to Dismiss (docket no. #8 ) is now moot. Accordingly, the hearing on the Motion to Dismiss set for 12/3/2018 is vacated. The hearing on the Motion to Remand (docket no. 10) remains set for 12/3/2018, but the Court hereby notifies the parties that the hearing will be held at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by DeBorah Smith. (Kleczek, David) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by DeBorah Smith.. (Kleczek, David) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand filed by DeBorah Smith. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 11/9/2018. Replies due by 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration, #(2) [Proposed] Order)(Kleczek, David) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 Brief re #8 MOTION to Dismiss - (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion) filed by United Continental Holdings, Inc.. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION to Dismiss [FRCP 12(b)(6)] filed by United Continental Holdings, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 11/7/2018. Replies due by 11/14/2018. (Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by United Continental Holdings, Inc. of re #2 Jury Demand, re #5 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities & re #1 Notice of Removal (Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United Continental Holdings, Inc... (Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 10/18/2018)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/31/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by United Continental Holdings, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate United Airlines, Inc., Other Affiliate Global Aerospace Inc. for United Continental Holdings, Inc.. (Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by United Continental Holdings, Inc.. (Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-568732, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12770833). Filed by United Continental Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Grotch, Richard) (Filed on 10/17/2018) Modified on 10/19/2018 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. United Continental Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeBorah Smith
Represented By: David Alexander Kleczek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Continental Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G. Grotch
Represented By: Mahmoud A. Fadli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G. Grotch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taneka Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?