Evanston Police Pension Fund v. McKesson Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Evanston Police Pension Fund
Defendant: James Beer, McKesson Corporation and John H. Hammergren
Case Number: 3:2018cv06525
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12946198.) filed by James Beer, John H. Hammergren, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing)(Wechkin, Robin) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR ALL DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #17 Stipulation. A Joint Status Report due by 4/19/2019. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for All Defendants to Respond to Complaint and Continuing CMC and Associated Deadlines filed by Evanston Police Pension Fund. (Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Evanston Police Pension Fund. Service waived by McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 12/6/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Evanston Police Pension Fund. Service waived by John H. Hammergren waiver sent on 11/21/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Evanston Police Pension Fund. Service waived by James Beer waiver sent on 11/21/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by McKesson Corporation identifying Corporate Parent McKesson Corporation for McKesson Corporation. (Bartlett, Jaime) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by McKesson Corporation identifying Corporate Parent McKesson Corporation, Other Affiliate Wellington Management Group LLP for McKesson Corporation. (Bartlett, Jaime) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by James Beer, John H. Hammergren identifying Other Affiliate John H. Hammergren for John H. Hammergren; Other Affiliate James Beer for James Beer. (Bartlett, Jaime) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime Allyson Bartlett for defendants McKesson Corporation, John H. Hammergren, and James Beer (Bartlett, Jaime) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara B. Brody for defendants McKesson Corporation, John H. Hammergren, and James Beer (Brody, Sara) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Evanston Police Pension Fund Notice of Filing and Service of Notice Required by 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(3)(A)(i) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 Refund Status re #6 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 26D3O58Q by Evanston Police Pension Fund. (Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to McKesson Corporation. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras SEC Class Action Notice due by 11/15/2018. Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2019 08:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Beer, John H. Hammergren, McKesson Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12794485.). Filed byEvanston Police Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification)(Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 10/25/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evanston Police Pension Fund v. McKesson Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evanston Police Pension Fund
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Beer
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Robin Eve Wechkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Robin Eve Wechkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Hammergren
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Robin Eve Wechkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?