Front Range Equine Rescue et al v. Christiansen et al
Plaintiff: Front Range Equine Rescue, Cindy Machado, The Humane Society of the United States, Return to Freedom, Rosemary Frieborn, Humane Society of the Sierra Foothills, Marin Humane Society and Marin Humane
Defendant: Vicki Christiansen, US Forest Service, Randy Moore, Amanda McAdams and George "Sonny" Perdue
Amicus Curiae: Modoc County Farm Bureau, Wilson Ranches, Public Lands Council, California Cattlemen's Association, Green Valley Corporation, Modoc County, Devil's Garden Preservation Group and California Farm Bureau
Intervenor Defendant: The Coalition for the Responsible Management of the Modoc National Forest
Case Number: 3:2018cv06531
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 32 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byThe Coalition for the Responsible Management of the Modoc National Forest. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bill Wilson in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration of Sean Curtis in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration of Mike Byrne in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Declaration of Jess Dancer in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Declaration of Chris Carr in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION to Intervene filed by The Coalition for the Responsible Management of the Modoc National Forest. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/3/2019. Replies due by 1/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chris Carr in Support of Coalition's Motion to Intervene, #2 Declaration of Bill Wilson in Support of Coalition's Motion to Intervene, #3 Declaration of Sean Curtis in Support of Coalition's Motion to Intervene, #4 Declaration of Mike Byrne in Support of Coalition's Motion to Intervene, #5 Declaration of Jess Dancer in Support of Coalition's Motion to Intervene, #6 Proposed Order)(Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Caroline Lobdell ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12947321.) filed by The Coalition for the Responsible Management of the Modoc National Forest. (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 29 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byVicki Christiansen, Amanda McAdams, Randy Moore, George "Sonny" Perdue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - McAdams Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Frolli Declaration)(Walker, Davene) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 18, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for January 31, 2019, at 10:00 am. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. The Court confirms January 31, 2019, at 10:00 am for the hearing on the injunction motion. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/18/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE by Vicki Christiansen, Amanda McAdams, Randy Moore, George "Sonny" Perdue re 26 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Turner, Rickey) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order re #25 . The dates available for a hearing are January 24 or 31, 2019. The parties are directed to pick one and promptly advise the Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 11, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Reschedule the January 24, 2019 Oral Argument (UNOPPOSED) filed by Vicki Christiansen, Amanda McAdams, Randy Moore, George "Sonny" Perdue. Responses due by 12/26/2018. Replies due by 1/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Turner, Rickey) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re Dkt. No. #23 . The Court appreciates the parties' scheduling cooperation. The dates and page limits are approved. The hearing is set for January 24, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/6/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Revised Briefing Schedule filed by Vicki Christiansen, Randy Moore, George "Sonny" Perdue. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walker, Davene) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Telephonic Scheduling Hearing held on 12/4/2018. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/4/2018)
November 30, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 12/4/2018 11:00 AM before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. The Court sets a telephonic hearing with the parties in Animal Legal Defense Fund v. Christiansen, 18-6410, and Front Range Equine Rescue v. Christiansen, 18-6531, for December 4, 2018, at 11:00 AM PST. The parties should be prepared to discuss the proposed schedule in Dkt. No. 19 in 18-6410 and Dkt. No. 17 in 18-6531. The parties are directed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 by no later than 24 hours in advance of the call to schedule their appearances. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/30/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE AUTHORIZATION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Modoc County, Modoc County Farm Bureau, Wilson Ranches, Green Valley Corporation, Devil's Garden Preservation Group, California Farm Bureau, California Cattlemen's Association, Public Lands Council. (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Rosemary Frieborn, Front Range Equine Rescue, Humane Society of the Sierra Foothills, Cindy Machado, Marin Humane, Return to Freedom, The Humane Society of the United States. Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/10/2018. Replies due by 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Proposed Order 17- Proposed Order)(Wagman, Bruce) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE by Vicki Christiansen, Amanda McAdams, Randy Moore, George "Sonny" Perdue of Lodging Preliminary Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certification)(Walker, Davene) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 17 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Briefing Schedule and Enlargement of Page Limits , Stipulated by all Parties, filed by Vicki Christiansen, Amanda McAdams, Randy Moore, George "Sonny" Perdue. Responses due by 11/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walker, Davene) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Address by Bruce Andrew Wagman (Wagman, Bruce) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rosemary Frieborn, Front Range Equine Rescue, Humane Society of the Sierra Foothills, Cindy Machado, Marin Humane, Return to Freedom, The Humane Society of the United States (Wiltshire, Molly) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Lauren Wiltshire (Wiltshire, Molly) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 13 Case reassigned to Judge James Donato. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/7/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order, signed 11/2/18, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Molly L. Wiltshire.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Davene Dashawn Walker (Walker, Davene) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr (Turner, Rickey) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Vicki Christiansen, Amanda McAdams, Randy Moore, George "Sonny" Perdue, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/9/2018. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice with Proposed Order (Filing fee $ 310.00, receipt number 0971-12795561.) filed by Rosemary Frieborn, Front Range Equine Rescue, Humane Society of the Sierra Foothills, Cindy Machado, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, The Humane Society of the United States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Plaintiffs represented by Movant, #2 Exhibit IL Bar Letter of Good Standing) (Wiltshire, Molly) (Filed on 10/25/2018) Modified on 10/26/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by Rosemary Frieborn, Front Range Equine Rescue, Humane Society of the Sierra Foothills, Cindy Machado, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, The Humane Society of the United States. (Wagman, Bruce) (Filed on 10/25/2018) Modified on 10/26/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Rosemary Frieborn, Front Range Equine Rescue, Humane Society of the Sierra Foothills, Cindy Machado, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, The Humane Society of the United States (Wagman, Bruce) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Wagman, Bruce) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Vicki Christiansen, George "Sonny" Perdue, Randy Moore and Amanda McAdams (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-12795136.). Filed by Rosemary Frieborn, Marin Humane Society, Return to Freedom, The Humane Society of the United States, Front Range Equine Rescue, Cindy Machado, Humane Society of the Sierra Foothills. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Wagman, Bruce) (Filed on 10/25/2018) Modified on 10/26/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Front Range Equine Rescue et al v. Christiansen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Christiansen
Represented By: Davene Dashawn Walker
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Moore
Represented By: Davene Dashawn Walker
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda McAdams
Represented By: Davene Dashawn Walker
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George "Sonny" Perdue
Represented By: Davene Dashawn Walker
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Front Range Equine Rescue
Represented By: Bruce Andrew Wagman
Represented By: Molly Lauren Wiltshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Machado
Represented By: Bruce Andrew Wagman
Represented By: Molly Lauren Wiltshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Humane Society of the United States
Represented By: Bruce Andrew Wagman
Represented By: Molly Lauren Wiltshire
Represented By: Kimberly D. Ockene
Represented By: Jonathan Russell Lovvorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Return to Freedom
Represented By: Bruce Andrew Wagman
Represented By: Molly Lauren Wiltshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Frieborn
Represented By: Bruce Andrew Wagman
Represented By: Molly Lauren Wiltshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humane Society of the Sierra Foothills
Represented By: Bruce Andrew Wagman
Represented By: Molly Lauren Wiltshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marin Humane Society
Represented By: Bruce Andrew Wagman
Represented By: Molly Lauren Wiltshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marin Humane
Represented By: Bruce Andrew Wagman
Represented By: Molly Lauren Wiltshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Modoc County Farm Bureau
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Wilson Ranches
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Public Lands Council
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California Cattlemen's Association
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Green Valley Corporation
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Modoc County
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Devil's Garden Preservation Group
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California Farm Bureau
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: The Coalition for the Responsible Management of the Modoc National Forest
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?