Finjan, Inc. v. Fortinet Inc.
Plaintiff: Finjan, Inc.
Defendant: Fortinet Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv06555
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Michael Holmes as Counsel for Defendant Fortinet, Inc. (Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Sang-Chul Pak as Counsel for Defendant Fortinet, Inc. (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Iman Lordgooei as Counsel for Defendant Fortinet, Inc. (Lordgooei, Iman) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fortinet Inc. (Zivojnovic, Ognjen) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fortinet Inc. (Zivojnovic, Ognjen) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Ognjen Zivojnovic as Counsel for Defendant Fortinet, Inc. (Zivojnovic, Ognjen) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment against Finjan, Inc. byFortinet Inc.. (Zivojnovic, Ognjen) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE STAY. Response due by 12/27/2018. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/3/2019 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/17/2018. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Finjan, Inc. re #16 Statement Plaintiff Finjan, Inc.'s Report on Active Litigation in this District (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 3, 2018 Filing 16 Statement Plaintiff Finjan, Inc.'s Report on Active Litigation in this District by Finjan, Inc.. (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. Several of the Finjan patents asserted in this case appear to be under active litigation before other judges in this district. The Court is concerned about how this situation may affect case management, and the efficient use of judicial and party resources. To address those concerns, Finjan is directed to file by December 3, 2018, a report specifying: (1) the patents in this case that are also asserted in any other open case in this district; (2) for each patent asserted here, the name and case numbers of the other open cases where that patent is also asserted; (3) the extent to which the claims within the patents asserted here are also being litigated in those cases; and (4) whether Finjan has advised any judge in this district about the areas of patent and claim overlap that it might find to exist after its investigation. To the extent possible, Finjan should present this information in an easy to read format such as a chart or spreadsheet. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/16/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Finjan, Inc. (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 12, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,,, Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1 filed by Finjan, Inc.. (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 11/12/2018)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/2/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Finjan, Inc.. Fortinet Inc. served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Finjan, Inc. (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 10/29/2018) Modified on 10/30/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Fortinet Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/9/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding A Patent or Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Finjan, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Finjan Holdings, Inc. for Finjan, Inc.. re #1 Complaint,,, (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement with jury demand against Fortinet Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12797368.). Filed by Finjan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andre, Paul) (Filed on 10/26/2018) Modified on 10/29/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finjan, Inc. v. Fortinet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortinet Inc.
Represented By: Iman Lordgooei
Represented By: Ognjen Zivojnovic
Represented By: Andrew Michael Holmes
Represented By: Sean Sang-Chul Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Finjan, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Andre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?