Johnson S. v. UnitedHealthcare et al
Plaintiff: Johnson S.
Defendant: APPLE INC. HEALTH AND WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN (510) and UNITEDHEALTHCARE
Case Number: 3:2018cv06631
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2018)
December 24, 2018 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2019 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District, #3 Standing Order for Certain Cases) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2018) Modified on 12/24/2018 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/24/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan (510), UnitedHealthcare.. (Joo, Sylvia) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to re #1 Complaint filed by Apple Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan (510), UnitedHealthcare. (Hill, Courtney) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johnson S.. Apple Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan (510) served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johnson S.. UnitedHealthcare served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 CORRECTED Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Johnson S... (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan (510), UnitedHealthcare. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/14/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Spielman, Katie) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 (ERISA); Enforcement and Clarification of Rights; Prejudgment and Postjudgment Interest; and Attorneys' Fees and Costs against Apple Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan (510), UnitedHealthcare, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12810005). Filed by Johnson S.. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet) (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 10/31/2018) Modified on 11/5/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson S. v. UnitedHealthcare et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson S.
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLE INC. HEALTH AND WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN (510)
Represented By: Courtney Culwell Hill
Represented By: Sylvia Joo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITEDHEALTHCARE
Represented By: Courtney Culwell Hill
Represented By: Sylvia Joo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?