Pearson v. Davis

Defendant: Ron Davis
Petitioner: Michael N Pearson
Undetermined: Habeas Capital Notification
Case Number: 3:2018cv06651
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
0 Judge: DPLC ALL
1 Judge: William Alsup
2 Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
3 Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/28/2018. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2018)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Regarding Request for Appointment of Counsel, Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, and Stay of Execution by Judge William Alsup. #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - GRANTED. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Filing of New Death Penalty Action. (This is a text-only entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings pursuant to Order of Recusal. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh and Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael N Pearson. (Schlesinger, Joseph) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Michael N Pearson . (Schlesinger, Joseph) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Stay of Execution , request for appointment of counsel. Filed byMichael N Pearson. (Schlesinger, Joseph) (Filed on 11/1/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearson v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Habeas Capital Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael N Pearson
Represented By: Joseph Schlesinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?