Cheever v. Huawei Device USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Paul Cheever
Defendant: Huawei Device U.S.A. Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv06715
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #12 Motion to Continue; granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference, and Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to re #1 Complaint filed by Paul Cheever. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration Declaration of Timothy Byron in Support of Stipulated Request for Order Continuing Deadlines)(Byron, Timothy) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Paul Cheever re #9 Summons Issued for Defendant Huawei Device USA, Inc. (Byron, Timothy) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Paul Cheever. Service waived by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 12/19/2018, answer due 3/19/2019. (Byron, Timothy) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. & Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Byron, Timothy) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Due to a change in the Court's availability, the Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2018 is continued as follows: Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding copyright infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #(1) Standing Order For All Civil Cases Before District Judge Jon S. Tigar, #(2) Standing Order For All Judges, #(3) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Philip Raphael (Raphael, Jordan) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-15 filed by Paul Cheever (Byron, Timothy) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT; Demand for Jury Trial against Huawei Device USA, Inc. & Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12822583). Filed by Paul Cheever. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Byron, Timothy) (Filed on 11/5/2018) Modified on 11/7/2018 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheever v. Huawei Device USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Device U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Device USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Cheever
Represented By: Jordan Philip Raphael
Represented By: Timothy David Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?