Griffin v. Lizaraga

Petitioner: Willie Russel Griffin
Respondent: Joe Lizaraga
Case Number: 3:2018cv06733
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
0 Judge: PSLC MWD
1 Judge: William H Orrick
2 Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 26, 2018 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 19, 2018 5 DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Willie Russel Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 6, 2018 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 3 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 34611137960. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Willie Russel Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed by Willie Russel Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Lizaraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willie Russel Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joe Lizaraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?