Barger v. United States
Plaintiff: II Sonny Barger, II
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 3:2018cv06746
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Referring Judge: Edward M Chen
2 Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 Mail sent to Sonny Barger returned as undeliverable re #6 Order Reassigning Case. Mail Returned; response required by 3/4/2019. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Sent to Sonny Barger Returned as Undeliverable re #5 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. Mail Returned; response required by 3/4/2019. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/13/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
November 19, 2018 Added name of plaintiff's CDCR facility and "aka Gary Fisher," plaintiff's name according to CDCR, to address field to facilitate mail delivery.(ljf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018).
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to a United States Magistrate Judge. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 12/17/2018. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sonny Barger, II. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Under Civil Rights Act (no process) against United States, (Filing Fee: Ifpp entered on 11/7/2018). Filed by Sonny Barger, II. (Attachments: #(1) Letter, #(2) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barger v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: II Sonny Barger, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?