East Bay Sanctuary Covenant et al v. Trump et al

Plaintiff: Central American Resource Center, Innovation Law Lab, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant and Al Otro Lado
Defendant: Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), Acting Dir. U.S.ICE Ronald D. Vitiello, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, President of U.S. Donald J. Trump, U.S Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, Commissioner U.S.CBP Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Dir. USCIS Lee Francis Cissna, Dir. EOIR James McHenry, Attorney General Matthew G. Whitaker, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Secretary of DHS Kirstjen M. Nielsen and Attorney General Mathew Whitaker
Amicus Curiae: Central American Refugee Center, Safe Passage Project, Make the Road New York, Office of United Nations High Commissioner for Refugees, Public Law Center, National Center for Lesbian Rights, The Legal Project, Torture Abolition Survivors Support Coalition, City Bar Justice Center, State of Washington, Immigration Law Professors, CASA, Public Citizen, Inc., Immigrant Legal Resource Center, State of California, Her Justice, Loyola Immigrant Justice Clinic, New York Immigration Coalition, University of California, Irvine School of Law Immigrant Rights, UnLocal, Inc., Bet Tzedek, Asian Law Alliance, Immigration Reform Law Institute, International Refugee Assistance Project, Dolores Street Community Services, Immigrant Justice Corps, LatinoJustice PRLDEF, HIAS and Council Migration Services, Inc. of Philadelphia, Empire Justice Center and Legal Aid Society of New York
Case Number: 3:2018cv06810
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL AND ADDITION OF COUNSEL FOR AMICUS CURIAE PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. re #104 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Public Citizen, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 4, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
January 4, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Lindsay Polastri Nako (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Permitting withdrawal and addition of counsel for amicus curiae Public Citizen, Inc.)(Nako, Lindsay) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER of USCA as to #100 Notice of Appeal filed by Ronald D. Vitiello, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, James McHenry, Matthew G. Whitaker, U.S Customs and Border Protection, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Lee Francis Cissna, Donald J. Trump. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 27, 2018 Filing 102 USCA Case Number 18-17436 for #100 Notice of Appeal filed by Ronald D. Vitiello, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, James McHenry, Matthew G. Whitaker, U.S Customs and Border Protection, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Lee Francis Cissna, Donald J. Trump. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER of USCA as to #51 Notice of Appeal filed by Ronald D. Vitiello, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, James McHenry, Matthew G. Whitaker, U.S Customs and Border Protection, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Lee Francis Cissna, Donald J. Trump. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 26, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Lee Francis Cissna, Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald J. Trump, U.S Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker. Appeal of Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Strike #99 - (Appeal Fee: FEE WAIVED) (Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 12/26/2018)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #71 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying #88 Motion to Strike. Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 98 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Show Cause Hearing held on 12/19/2018, Motion Hearing held on 12/19/2018 re #71 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab, Central American Resource Center, Al Otro Lado. Total Time in Court: 41 minutes. Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2018)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER of USCA Denying Government's Emergency Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal as to #51 Notice of Appeal filed by Ronald D. Vitiello, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, James McHenry, Matthew G. Whitaker, U.S Customs and Border Protection, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Lee Francis Cissna, Donald J. Trump. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 96 USCA ORDER - Dissenting in Part as to #51 Notice of Appeal filed by Ronald D. Vitiello, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, James McHenry, Matthew G. Whitaker, U.S Customs and Border Protection, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Lee Francis Cissna, Donald J. Trump. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 95 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Al Otro Lado, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab, Central American Resource Center Served Upon All Defendants. (Newell, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 16, 2018 Filing 94 REPLY (re #88 MOTION to Strike #71 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, re #35 Reply to Opposition/Response, re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order) filed by Lee Francis Cissna, Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald J. Trump, U.S Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order Updated)(Greer, Christina) (Filed on 12/16/2018)
December 15, 2018 Filing 93 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #88 MOTION to Strike #71 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, re #35 Reply to opposition/Response, re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order) filed by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Gelernt, Lee) (Filed on 12/15/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 92 REPLY (re #71 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byAl Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Gelernt, Lee) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #88 MOTION to Strike. Responses due 12/15/2018 by 5:00 PM. Replies due 12/16/2018 by 5:00 PM. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER of USCA as to #51 Notice of Appeal filed by Ronald D. Vitiello, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, James McHenry, Matthew G. Whitaker, U.S Customs and Border Protection, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Lee Francis Cissna, Donald J. Trump. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part #89 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #88 MOTION to Strike. Responses due by 5:00 p.m. on 12/15/2018. Replies due by 5:00 p.m. on 12/16/2018. (jstlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 89 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Strike Extra-Record Evidence filed by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gelernt, Lee) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 12, 2018 Filing 88 MOTION to Strike #71 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, re #35 Reply to Opposition/Response, re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lee Francis Cissna, Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald J. Trump, U.S Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker. Responses due by 12/26/2018. Replies due by 1/2/2019. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Greer, Christina) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 12, 2018 Filing 87 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #71 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed by Lee Francis Cissna, Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald J. Trump, U.S Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEFS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #81 Motion for Leave to File; granting #82 Motion for Leave to File. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 85 Statement of Non-Opposition to re #81 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, re #82 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief of the States of California, Washington, Massachusetts, New York, Connecticut, Hawaii, Illinois, Maryland, Minnesota, New Jersey, Oregon, Vermont, and the District of Columbia - RESPONSE to Court's Order on Amicus Filings filed by Lee Francis Cissna, Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald J. Trump, U.S Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker. (Related document(s) #81 , #82 ) (Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE OF ERRATA regarding ECF No. 71-8 (Notice of Corrected Declaration) filed by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Nicole Ramos)(Gelernt, Lee) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #81 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, #82 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief of the States of California, Washington, Massachusetts, New York, Connecticut, Hawaii, Illinois, Maryland, Minnesota, New Jersey, Oregon, Vermont, and the District of Columbia. Responses due 12/7/2018 by 5:00 PM. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING IN PART LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEFS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #75 Motion for Leave to File; granting #77 Motion for Leave to File; granting #78 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief; granting #80 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. The Court further orders Defendants to file any objections to the #81 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by United Nations High Commissioner for Refugees or #82 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief of the States of California, Washington, Massachusetts, New York, Connecticut, Hawaii, Illinois, Maryland, Minnesota, New Jersey, Oregon, Vermont, and the District of Columbia proposed briefs by 5:00 pm on December 7, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief of the States of California, Washington, Massachusetts, New York, Connecticut, Hawaii, Illinois, Maryland, Minnesota, New Jersey, Oregon, Vermont, and the District of Columbia filed by State of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: States' Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Zahradka, James) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Office of United Nations High Commissioner for Refugees. (Attachments: #(1) Amicus Curiae Brief)(Pearsall, Patrick) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 80 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Jocelyn Dion Larkin on behalf of Public Citizen Litigation Group. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Curiae Brief, #2 Certification of Interested Entities, #3 Corporate Disclosure)(Larkin, Jocelyn) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 79 Brief in Support of re #77 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Immigration Law Professors. (Related document(s) #77 ) (Marcus, David) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 78 AGREED MOTION OF TWENTY-THREE ORGANIZATIONS REPRESENTING ASYLUM SEEKERS FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Asian Law Alliance, Bet Tzedek, CASA, Central American Refugee Center, City Bar Justice Center, Dolores Street Community Services, Empire Justice Center, Her Justice, HIAS and Council Migration Services, Inc. of Philadelphia, Immigrant Justice Corps, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, International Refugee Assistance Project, LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Legal Aid Society of New York, Loyola Immigrant Justice Clinic, Make the Road New York, New York Immigration Coalition, Public Law Center, Safe Passage Project, The Legal Project, Torture Abolition Survivors Support Coalition, University of California, Irvine School of Law Immigrant Rights, UnLocal, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 12/19/2018. Replies due by 12/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Amicus Brief)(Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Immigration Law Professors. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marcus, David) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by David Charles Marcus as Counsel for Amici Curiae Professors of Immigration Law (Marcus, David) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 75 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae NCLR et al. filed by National Center for Lesbian Rights. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae, #2 Proposed Order)(Wilensky, Julie) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Wilensky for proposed Amicus NCLR et al. (Wilensky, Julie) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #72 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 72 First MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12900213) filed by Immigration Law Professors. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Certificate in Good Standing)(Wadhia, Shoba) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 12/12/2018. Replies due by 12/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Corrected Pinheiro Supp., #3 Declaration Alvarez, #4 Declaration Joint Former Officials, #5 Declaration Slack, #6 Declaration Mitchell-Bennett, #7 Declaration Brane, #8 Declaration Ramos, #9 Declaration Penman Supp., #10 Declaration Smith Supp., #11 Declaration Manning Second Supp.)(Gelernt, Lee) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #68 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 69 USCA Case Number 18-17274 for #51 Notice of Appeal filed by Ronald D. Vitiello, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, James McHenry, Matthew G. Whitaker, U.S Customs and Border Protection, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Lee Francis Cissna & Donald J. Trump. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12898756) filed by Immigration Law Professors. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate in Good Standing)(Margulies, Peter) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #66 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice for Melissa Crow, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12896080) filed by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Newell, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 3, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur (Amdur, Spencer) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #63 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
December 3, 2018 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12893705) filed by United Nations High Commissioner for Refugees. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Pearsall, Patrick) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
December 3, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Hauck on behalf of United Nations High Commissioner for Refugees (Hauck, Brian) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #52 Motion to Stay. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE filed by Lee Francis Cissna, Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald J. Trump, U.S Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker of Filing of the Administrative Record (Greer, Christina) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 59 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #52 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #43 Order on Motion for TRO) filed by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Gelernt, Lee) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina P Greer (Greer, Christina) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 29, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2018 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Correcting docketing error. Time of hearing set by the Order at docket number #50 . (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Benton York (York, Thomas) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER RE: STIPULATED EXTENSION FOR PRODUCTION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD re #55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 28, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 55 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re #50 Order filed by Lee Francis Cissna, Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald J. Trump, U.S Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker. (Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 27, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #52 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #43 Order on Motion for TRO. Responses due 11/29/2018 by 5:00 PM. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part #53 Emergency MOTION to Shorten Time. Plaintiffs' opposition to #52 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #43 Order on Motion for TRO due by 11/29/2018 at 5:00 p.m. The Court will rule on the motion to stay by the end of 11/30/2018. (jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 53 Emergency MOTION to Shorten Time For Decision on Motion to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Lee Francis Cissna, Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald J. Trump, U.S Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 52 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #43 Order on Motion for TRO, filed by Lee Francis Cissna, Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald J. Trump, U.S Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker. Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 12/11/2018. Replies due by 12/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Lee Francis Cissna, Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald J. Trump, U.S Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker. Appeal of Order on Motion for TRO, #43 - (Appeal Fee: FEE WAIVED). (Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction due 12/3/2018. Amicus briefs in support of Plaintiffs or neither party due 12/5/2018. Defendants' opposition due 12/12/2018 by 12:00 PM. Amicus briefs in support of Defendants due 12/12/2018 by 12:00 PM. Plaintiffs' reply due 12/14/2018. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 27, 2018. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MARY BAUER PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 48 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Gelernt, Lee) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 21, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice Mary Bauer, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12867291) filed by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Newell, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 46 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/19/2018 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Wofsy, Cody) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 45 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 19, 2018, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #44 Transcript Order,, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2019. (Related documents(s) #44 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 44 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/19/2018 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Lee Francis Cissna, Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), Immigration Reform Law Institute, Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald J. Trump, U.S Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Genova, Francesca) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #8 Motion for TRO. Stipulation or proposals due by 11/26/2018. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/19/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 19, 2018 Filing 42 Joint MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief to Deem Amicus Brief Filed filed by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2018 04:00 PM before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 11/19/2018. Replies due by 11/19/2018. (Lin, Megan) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY GHITA SCHWARZ PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 19, 2018 Filing 40 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12859792.) filed by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Schwarz, Ghita) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 19, 2018 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 11/19/2018 re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab, Central American Resource Center, Al Otro Lado. Total Time in Court: 1 hour, 19 minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/19/2018)
November 18, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Francesca M Genova (Genova, Francesca) (Filed on 11/18/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 37 Brief re 36 Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,, Amicus Brief filed as previously lodged as ECF 34-2 filed byImmigration Reform Law Institute. (Related document(s) 36 ) (Joseph, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEFAmicus Curiae Immigration Reform Law Institutes (IRLI) has filed a motion for leave to file an amicus brief. ECF No. 34. The brief seeks to support Defendants' arguments that Plaintiffs lack standing to bring their lawsuit. ECF No. 34-2 at 5. The motion was filed less than 90 minutes before Plaintiffs' reply brief was due, and in fact Plaintiffs' reply brief has now been filed. Nonetheless, given the importance of the case and to ensure full consideration of all the relevant issues, the Court GRANTS the motion. IRLI's brief is not deemed filed. IRLI must file its brief by Saturday, November 16, 2018, at 5:00 p.m.IRLI's brief appears to repeat arguments already made by the Government, as IRLI acknowledges. ECF No. 34 at 4. Plaintiffs might therefore conclude that no response is necessary. Should they wish to file one, however, they may do so by Sunday, November 18, 2018, at 4:00 p.m. Any such response must not exceed four pages, the length of IRLI's brief. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 16, 2018 Filing 35 REPLY (re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byAl Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chavla, #2 Declaration of Cutlip-Mason, #3 Declaration of Griffey, #4 Declaration of Isacson, #5 Declaration of Love, #6 Declaration of Manning, #7 Declaration of Penman, #8 Declaration of Pinheiro, #9 Declaration of Rodriguez, #10 Declaration Seyler)(Gelernt, Lee) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief on Jurisdictional Issues in Support of Defendants filed by Immigration Reform Law Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service COS)(Joseph, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANGELO GUISADO PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE REGARDING VIDEO RECORDING re: #16 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. All parties have consented to the video recording of the proceeding. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Celso Javier Perez (Perez, Celso) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Michelle Veroff (Veroff, Julie) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott G. Stewart (Stewart, Scott) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 28 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Angelo Guisado ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12854228.) filed by Al Otro Lado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Guisado, Angelo) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 27 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) filed byLee Francis Cissna, Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR), Kevin K. McAleenan, James McHenry, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Donald J. Trump, U.S Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF BAHER AZMY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 25 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Baher Azmy ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12848902.) filed by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate Good Standing)(Azmy, Baher) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JUDY RABINOVITZ PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY OMAR JADWAT PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY LEE GELERNT PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER UNSEALING DOCKET. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 14, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEFBefore the Court is an Administrative Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Brief in support of Plaintiffs' request for a temporary restraining order, filed by the States of Washington, Massachusetts, New York, and California (the "States"). ECF No. 19. The motion includes the proposed amicus brief as an exhibit. See ECF No. 19-1. The States represent that Defendants do not oppose the motion, provided that the proposed amicus brief is fewer than ten pages and this motion was filed by 6:00 p.m. on November 14, 2018. ECF No. 19 at 2. The States have complied with these requirements. See ECF No. 19-1."There are no strict prerequisites that must be established prior to qualifying for amicus status; an individual seeking to appear as amicus must merely make a showing that his participation is useful to or otherwise desirable to the court." In re Roxford Foods Litig., 790 F. Supp. 987, 997 (E.D. Cal. 1991) (citation omitted). Having reviewed the proposed amicus brief, the Court grants the States' motion for leave to file.The States shall file their proposed amicus brief, see ECF No. 19-1, as soon as practicable, and in any event, no later than November 15, 2018 by 12:00 p.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 14, 2018 Filing 19 Consent MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief on Shortened Time filed by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2018 06:00 PM before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 11/14/2018. Replies due by 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief of Amicus Curiae)(Lin, Megan) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab (Wofsy, Cody) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 16 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. Video Camera hearing set for 11/19/2018 at 9:30 AM. Objections to Video Recording due 11/16/2018 by 12:00 PM. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Patricia Sun (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Vasudha Talla (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Erez R. Reuveni (Reuveni, Erez) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab, Central American Resource Center, Al Otro Lado. Responses due by 11/15/2018. Replies due by 11/16/2018. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2018 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 13, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab (Newell, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of a Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Declaration Adam Isacson, #3 Declaration of Daniel Sharp, #4 Declaration of Erika Pinheiro, #5 Declaration of Guy Goodwin-Gill, #6 Declaration of Stephen Manning, #7 Declaration of Michael Smith, #8 Proposed Order, #9 Common)(Newell, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12838819.) filed by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Jadwat, Omar) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12838766.) filed by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Rabinovitz, Judy) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 26DE7N7T.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/9/2018 filed by Al Otro Lado, Central American Resource Center, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab. (Gelernt, Lee) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody H. Wofsy (Wofsy, Cody) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Newell, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/23/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Immigration Action) against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12836235). Filed by Al Otro Lado, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab, Central American Resource Center. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Newell, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12836235.). Filed byAl Otro Lado, East Bay Sanctuary Covenant, Innovation Law Lab, Central American Resource Center. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Newell, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/9/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: East Bay Sanctuary Covenant et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR)
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Dir. U.S.ICE Ronald D. Vitiello
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President of U.S. Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Thomas Benton York
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner U.S.CBP Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dir. USCIS Lee Francis Cissna
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dir. EOIR James McHenry
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General Matthew G. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of DHS Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General Mathew Whitaker
Represented By: Christina P Greer
Represented By: Scott G. Stewart
Represented By: Erez R. Reuveni
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central American Resource Center
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Jennifer C. Newell
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Represented By: Celso Javier Perez
Represented By: Julie Michelle Veroff
Represented By: Vasudha Talla
Represented By: Christine Patricia Sun
Represented By: Melissa Crow
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: Angelo Guisado
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovation Law Lab
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Jennifer C. Newell
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Represented By: Celso Javier Perez
Represented By: Julie Michelle Veroff
Represented By: Vasudha Talla
Represented By: Christine Patricia Sun
Represented By: Melissa Crow
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: Angelo Guisado
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Bay Sanctuary Covenant
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Jennifer C. Newell
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Represented By: Celso Javier Perez
Represented By: Julie Michelle Veroff
Represented By: Vasudha Talla
Represented By: Christine Patricia Sun
Represented By: Melissa Crow
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: Angelo Guisado
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Otro Lado
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Jennifer C. Newell
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Judy Rabinovitz
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Represented By: Celso Javier Perez
Represented By: Julie Michelle Veroff
Represented By: Vasudha Talla
Represented By: Christine Patricia Sun
Represented By: Melissa Crow
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: Angelo Guisado
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Central American Refugee Center
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Safe Passage Project
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Make the Road New York
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Office of United Nations High Commissioner for Refugees
Represented By: Brian Hauck
Represented By: Patrick W Pearsall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Public Law Center
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Center for Lesbian Rights
Represented By: Amy Whelan
Represented By: Shannon Minter
Represented By: Julie Wilensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Legal Project
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Torture Abolition Survivors Support Coalition
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City Bar Justice Center
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Washington
Represented By: Megan Dy Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigration Law Professors
Represented By: Peter Simon Margulies
Represented By: David Charles Marcus
Represented By: Shoba Wadhia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CASA
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Public Citizen, Inc.
Represented By: Jocelyn Dion Larkin
Represented By: Lindsay Polastri Nako
Represented By: Rebecca Harriet Smullin
Represented By: David Sidney Shaffer Nahmias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigrant Legal Resource Center
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of California
Represented By: James F. Zahradka, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Her Justice
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Loyola Immigrant Justice Clinic
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New York Immigration Coalition
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: University of California, Irvine School of Law Immigrant Rights
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UnLocal, Inc.
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Bet Tzedek
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Law Alliance
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Represented By: Francesca M Genova
Represented By: Lawrence John Joseph, Josep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: International Refugee Assistance Project
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dolores Street Community Services
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigrant Justice Corps
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LatinoJustice PRLDEF
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HIAS and Council Migration Services, Inc. of Philadelphia
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Empire Justice Center
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Legal Aid Society of New York
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?