San Francisco Baykeeper v. United States Coast Guard Sector San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper
Defendant: Rear Admiral Peter W. Gautier and United States Coast Guard Sector San Francisco
Case Number: 3:2018cv06858
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #5 Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and Associated Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 3/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 4/1/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and Associated Deadlines filed by San Francisco Baykeeper. (Sasaki, Nicole) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by San Francisco Baykeeper.. (Sasaki, Nicole) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2019 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/27/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12841834.). Filed bySan Francisco Baykeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sasaki, Nicole) (Filed on 11/13/2018) Modified on 11/14/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Francisco Baykeeper v. United States Coast Guard Sector San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper
Represented By: Nicole Chiyeko Sasaki
Represented By: Erica Ann Maharg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rear Admiral Peter W. Gautier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Coast Guard Sector San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?