United States of America v. Approximately $26,990.26 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $26,990.26 in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2018cv06960
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1341
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 12/27/2018. (Proof of Publication of Notice of Forfeiture Action) (Cornell, Erin) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #7 Order on Ex Parte Application, #5 Proposed Warrant, #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #8 Clerk's Notice, #1 Complaint, #4 Notice (Other) (Cornell, Erin) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 Warrant of Arrest of Property In Rem (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #6 Ex Parte Application (Application and [Proposed] Order for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest of Property in Rem. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 Ex Parte Application (Application and [Proposed] Order for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest of Property in Rem) filed by United States of America. (Cornell, Erin) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Warrant. (Cornell, Erin) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America (Notice of Forfeiture Action) (Cornell, Erin) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 2/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2019 at 2:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified Complaint for Forfeiture) against Approximately $26,990.26 in United States Currency. Filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cornell, Erin) (Filed on 11/16/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $26,990.26 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $26,990.26 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Erin A. Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?