Moonan et al v. General Motors LLC

Plaintiff: John Thomas White, Richard Samson, Stacy Wade Sizelove, Sean M. Buob, Kenneth Munro, Sean T. Smith, Marcos R. Cobain, Jr., James Dustin Morganti, Ryan Maduro, Nicholas Brock, Michael L. McCoy, Jose Hernandez, Geoff Cochems, Colby Barry, Bruce K. Garlock, Kevin Allen Lawson, Thorin Jay Askin, Kevin Sutherland, Anthony Raymond Smith, Eric Thomas Corder, Brandon Tirozzi, Milton Leon Huss, Jr., Ernest Harold Miller, Ryan Arthur Jensen, Chris S. McAlister, Debra Kay Caskey, Douglas Hughes, Isaiah Rudy, Kaleb Bean, Christopher Moonan, Douglas Crenshaw, Bradley Rice, Kenny Tran and Michelle Diniz
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv07054
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
0 Judge: Jon S Tigar
1 Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 23 Consent ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 filed by General Motors LLC. Responses due by 1/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Foust, Joshua) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 22 STIPULATION to Extend Time for General Motors LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Without Court Order filed by General Motors LLC. (Foust, Joshua) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 21 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 12, 2018 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of Robert Hilliard, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12921380) filed by Thorin Jay Askin, Colby Barry, Kaleb Bean, Nicholas Brock, Sean M. Buob, Debra Kay Caskey, Marcos R. Cobain, Jr, Geoff Cochems, Eric Thomas Corder, Douglas Crenshaw, Michelle Diniz, Bruce K. Garlock, Jose Hernandez, Douglas Hughes, Milton Leon Huss, Jr, Ryan Arthur Jensen, Kevin Allen Lawson, Ryan Maduro, Chris S. McAlister, Michael L. McCoy, Ernest Harold Miller, Christopher Moonan, James Dustin Morganti. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 19 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 18 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 11, 2018 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice by April N. Ross, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12919644) filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ross, April) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice by Kathleen Taylor Sooy, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12919588) filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Sooy, Kathleen) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate General Motors Company for General Motors LLC. (Foust, Joshua) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 14 NOTICE by General Motors LLC of Pendency of Other Action or Proceedings (Foust, Joshua) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 13 JOINT STIPULATION to Extend Time for General Motors LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Without Court Order (Civ.L.R. 6-1(a)) filed by General Motors LLC. (Foust, Joshua) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 3, 2018 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Dustin Morganti, Michelle Diniz, Kenneth Munro, Ryan Arthur Jensen, Milton Leon Huss, Jr, Sean T. Smith, Ernest Harold Miller, Christopher Moonan, Geoff Cochems, Ryan Maduro, Eric Thomas Corder, Michael L. McCoy, Nicholas Brock, Stacy Wade Sizelove, Kaleb Bean, Debra Kay Caskey, Kevin Sutherland, Bradley Rice, Marcos R. Cobain, Jr, Bruce K. Garlock, Kenny Tran, Colby Barry, Kevin Allen Lawson, Thorin Jay Askin, Richard Samson, Isaiah Rudy, Anthony Raymond Smith, Chris S. McAlister, Douglas Hughes, Douglas Crenshaw, Jose Hernandez, Brandon Tirozzi, John Thomas White, Sean M. Buob. General Motors LLC served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 27, 2018 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/6/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY STEVE W. BERMAN PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 26, 2018 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 21, 2018 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12867844) filed by Thorin Jay Askin, Colby Barry, Kaleb Bean, Nicholas Brock, Sean M. Buob, Debra Kay Caskey, Marcos R. Cobain, Jr, Geoff Cochems, Eric Thomas Corder, Douglas Crenshaw, Michelle Diniz, Bruce K. Garlock, Jose Hernandez, Douglas Hughes, Milton Leon Huss, Jr, Ryan Arthur Jensen, Kevin Allen Lawson, Ryan Maduro, Chris S. McAlister, Michael L. McCoy, Ernest Harold Miller, Christopher Moonan, James Dustin Morganti, Kenneth Munro, Bradley Rice, Isaiah Rudy, Richard Samson, Stacy Wade Sizelove, Anthony Raymond Smith, Sean T. Smith, Kevin Sutherland, Brandon Tirozzi, Kenny Tran, John Thomas White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 21, 2018 6 DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Thorin Jay Askin, Colby Barry, Kaleb Bean, Nicholas Brock, Sean M. Buob, Debra Kay Caskey, Marcos R. Cobain, Jr, Geoff Cochems, Eric Thomas Corder, Douglas Crenshaw, Michelle Diniz, Bruce K. Garlock, Jose Hernandez, Douglas Hughes, Milton Leon Huss, Jr, Ryan Arthur Jensen, Kevin Allen Lawson, Ryan Maduro, Chris S. McAlister, Michael L. McCoy, Ernest Harold Miller, Christopher Moonan, James Dustin Morganti, Kenneth Munro, Bradley Rice, Isaiah Rudy, Richard Samson, Stacy Wade Sizelove, Anthony Raymond Smith, Sean T. Smith, Kevin Sutherland, Brandon Tirozzi, Kenny Tran, John Thomas White.. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 11/21/2018) Modified on 11/21/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2018 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 21, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Defendant General Motors LLC. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 20, 2018 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/4/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 20, 2018 2 Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 20, 2018 1 Class Action COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against Defendant General Motors LLC, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12864388). Filed by James Dustin Morganti, Michelle Diniz, Kenneth Munro, Ryan Arthur Jensen, Milton Leon Huss, Jr, Sean T. Smith, Ernest Harold Miller, Christopher Moonan, Geoff Cochems, Ryan Maduro, Eric Thomas Corder, Michael L. McCoy, Nicholas Brock, Stacy Wade Sizelove, Kaleb Bean, Debra Kay Caskey, Kevin Sutherland, Bradley Rice, Marcos R. Cobain, Jr, Bruce K. Garlock, Kenny Tran, Colby Barry, Kevin Allen Lawson, Thorin Jay Askin, Richard Samson, Isaiah Rudy, Anthony Raymond Smith, Chris S. McAlister, Douglas Hughes, Douglas Crenshaw, Jose Hernandez, Brandon Tirozzi, John Thomas White, Sean M. Buob. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Jeff) (Filed on 11/20/2018) Modified on 11/21/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moonan et al v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Thomas White
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Samson
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Wade Sizelove
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean M. Buob
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Munro
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean T. Smith
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos R. Cobain, Jr.
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dustin Morganti
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Maduro
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Brock
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. McCoy
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Hernandez
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoff Cochems
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colby Barry
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce K. Garlock
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Allen Lawson
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thorin Jay Askin
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Sutherland
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Raymond Smith
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Thomas Corder
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Tirozzi
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Leon Huss, Jr.
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Harold Miller
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Arthur Jensen
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris S. McAlister
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Kay Caskey
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Hughes
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Rudy
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaleb Bean
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Moonan
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Crenshaw
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Rice
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Tran
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Diniz
Represented By: Jeff D Friedman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Rudy F Gonzales, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Joshua Thomas Foust
Represented By: April Nelson Ross
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?