Center For Biological Diversity et al v. Ryan Zinke et al
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity and Environmental Protection Information Center
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service and Ryan Zinke
Case Number: 3:2018cv07211
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1538
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #12 MOTION TO STAY. By Judge Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 3/21/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Due To Lapse Of Appropriations (UNOPPOSED) filed by Ryan Zinke, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. Responses due by 2/5/2019. Replies due by 2/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yang, H.) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Hubert Yang (Yang, H.) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center For Biological Diversity, Environmental Protection Information Center. Ryan Zinke served on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019; U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service served on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019. (Loda, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 Civil Cover Sheet by Center For Biological Diversity, Environmental Protection Information Center CORRECTION OF DOCKET NO. 1-1. (Loda, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Segee (Segee, Brian) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Center For Biological Diversity, Environmental Protection Information Center (Loda, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ryan Zinke, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge William Alsup. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Loda, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12883698.). Filed byCenter For Biological Diversity, Environmental Protection Information Center. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Loda, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/29/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center For Biological Diversity et al v. Ryan Zinke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: H. Hubert Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Represented By: H. Hubert Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Loda
Represented By: Brian P. Segee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Protection Information Center
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Loda
Represented By: Brian P. Segee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?