Riordan v. Monsanto Company

Plaintiff: Vickie Riordan
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv07368
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:18-cv-01918. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DJO)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-112) regarding multidistrict litigation No. 2741 IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION signed by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Vickie Riordan Monsanto Company waiver signed on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Goza, Kirk)
November 13, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Charles A. Shaw. (BAK)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number 0865-6871211, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Vickie Riordan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Goza, Kirk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2018: #3 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #4 Waiver of Service) (JWD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riordan v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Riordan
Represented By: Kirk John Goza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?