Lis v. Monsanto Company

Plaintiff: William Lis
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv07369
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2018 6 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:18-cv-01920. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 6, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DJO)
December 6, 2018 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-112) regarding multidistrict litigation No. 2741 IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION signed by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO)
November 26, 2018 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by William Lis Monsanto Company waiver signed on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Goza, Kirk)
November 13, 2018 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
November 13, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (MFG)
November 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number 0865-6871621, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by William Lis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waiver Service of A Summons, #4 Waiver of Service)(Goza, Kirk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lis v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lis
Represented By: Kirk John Goza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?