Ward et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Subscribing to Certificate No. B1132HGBA15062712 et al

Plaintiff: Andre Ward and ROC NATION SPORTS, LLC
Defendant: International Specialty Insurance, Inc., a North Carolina Corporation, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Subscribing to Certificate No. B1132HGBA15062712 and International Specialty Insurance, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv07551
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Michael J. Frimet, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13081920.) filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Subscribing to Certificate No. B1132HGBA15062712. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Frimet, Michael) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION for Joinder Defendant International Specialty Insurance Services, Inc.'s Notice of Joinder in Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London's Motion to Dismiss, and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Memoran. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)Hearing was not set on CEO calendar.
February 8, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by International Specialty Insurance, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate RSUI Group, Inc. for International Specialty Insurance, Inc.. (Borys, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Joinder Defendant International Specialty Insurance Services, Inc.'s Notice of Joinder in Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London's Motion to Dismiss, and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by International Specialty Insurance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Borys, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 17 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss or Atlernatively MOTION to Change Venue ) filed byRoc Nation Sports, LLC, Andre Ward. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard C. Giller in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Proposed Order)(Giller, Richard) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 4, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Initial Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss or Atlernatively and MOTION to Change Venue . Motion Hearing re-set for 4/12/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Regardless of whether the Court reschedules the hearing date, all opposition and reply papers shall be timely filed pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-7(d). Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference, previously set for 3/15/19 at 2:00 PM, has been re-set for 4/12/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. Any party seeking a continuance shall e-file a stipulation and proposed order.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Subscribing to Certificate No. B1132HGBA15062712 identifying Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation, Corporate Parent Enstar Group Limited, Corporate Parent Beazley Furlonge Ltd., Corporate Parent RiverStone Management Limited, Corporate Parent AEGIS Electric & Gas International Services Ltd., Corporate Parent Vibe Corporate Member Limited, Corporate Parent Loews Corporation, Other Affiliate The Continental Corporation, Other Affiliate Hardy (Underwriting Agencies) Limited, Other Affiliate Hardy Underwriting Limited, Other Affiliate Hardy Underwriting Group Limited, Other Affiliate WRBC Corporate Member Limited, Other Affiliate W.R. Berkley Syndicate Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Novae Corporate Underwriting Limited, Other Affiliate SGL No.1 Limited, Other Affiliate Aegis London, Other Affiliate GAI Indemnity Limited, Other Affiliate Lavenham Underwriting Limited, Other Affiliate Sampford Underwriting Limited, Other Affiliate SCOR Underwriting Limited, Other Affiliate Vibe Syndicate Management Ltd, Other Affiliate CNA Financial Corporation for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Subscribing to Certificate No. B1132HGBA15062712. (Vogrin, George) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by International Specialty Insurance, Inc... (Novruzyan, Anna) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Subscribing to Certificate No. B1132HGBA15062712.. (Vogrin, George) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING re #9 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by International Specialty Insurance, Inc.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/25/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 2/1/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss or Atlernatively, MOTION to Change Venue filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Subscribing to Certificate No. B1132HGBA15062712. Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 2/7/2019. Replies due by 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of George J. Vogrin in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Vogrin, George) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by International Specialty Insurance, Inc.. (Borys, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Roc Nation Sports, LLC, Andre Ward re #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #1 Complaint,, #5 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #7 Summons Issued, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, and Standing Orders for Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero (Giller, Richard) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Subscribing to Certificate No. B1132HGBA15062712, International Specialty Insurance, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2018)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2018)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Roc Nation Sports, LLC, Andre Ward.. (Giller, Richard) (Filed on 12/27/2018) Modified on 12/28/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/31/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Roc Nation Sports, LLC, Andre Ward identifying Other Affiliate Live Nation Worldwide, Inc., Other Affiliate ROC Nation Sports, Other Affiliate Marcy Media, LLC for Andre Ward, Roc Nation Sports, LLC. re #1 Complaint (Giller, Richard) (Filed on 12/14/2018) Modified on 12/28/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Giller, Richard) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages; Jury Trial Requested against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Subscribing to Certificate No. B1132HGBA15062712, International Specialty Insurance, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-12931204.). Filed by Andre Ward, Roc Nation Sports, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Giller, Richard) (Filed on 12/14/2018) Modified on 12/28/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Subscribing to Certificate No. B1132HGBA15062712 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Specialty Insurance, Inc., a North Carolina Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Subscribing to Certificate No. B1132HGBA15062712
Represented By: George John Vogrin
Represented By: Michael James Frimet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Specialty Insurance, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Borys
Represented By: Anna Novruzyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Ward
Represented By: Richard Conant Giller
Represented By: Ashley Della Inouye Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROC NATION SPORTS, LLC
Represented By: Richard Conant Giller
Represented By: Ashley Della Inouye Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?